Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1781235

EP1781235 - ANTI-ALLERGY ACTIVITIES OF ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/19]ANTI-HYPERSENSITIVE INFLAMMATION AND ANTI-ALLERGY ACTIVITIES OF ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH
[2013/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2014  [2014/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wholesome Life Science Co., Ltd.
5F, 170, Sec 3 Ming-Chuan E. Rd
Taipei 105 / TW
[2007/19]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Tsung-Chung
3080 Eagle Pointe Drive
Fullerton, CA 92833 / US
02 / CHAUNG, Hso-Chi
Hseuh Fu Road
Neipu Hsiang
Ping Tung / TW
03 / HUANG, Chung-Sheng
12F, No. 170
Sec. 3 Ming-Chaun E.Rd
Taipei / TW
04 / LEE, Fun-Ya
12F, No. 170
Sec. 3 Ming-Chuan E. Rd
Taipei / TW
 [2013/52]
Former [2007/19]01 / LIN, Tsung-Chung
3080 Eagle Pointe Drive
Fullerton, CA 92833 / US
02 / CHAUNG, Hso-Chi
Hseuh Fu Road, Neipu Hsiang
Ping Tung / TW
03 / HUANG, Chung-Sheng
12F, No. 170, Sec. 3 Ming-Chaun E.Rd
Taipei / TW
04 / LEE, Fun-Ya
12F, No. 170, Sec. 3 Ming-Chuan E. Rd
Taipei / TW
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2008/30]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2007/19]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date05773393.318.07.2005
[2007/19]
WO2005US25458
Priority number, dateUS20040590552P23.07.2004         Original published format: US 590552 P
[2007/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006020246
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1781235
Date:09.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1781235
Date:25.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.02.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61P37/08, A61K36/9068
[2013/29]
Former International [2008/27]A61K36/9068
Former International [2007/19]A61K6/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/44]
Former [2007/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANTI-ALLERGIE-AKTIVITÄTEN VON ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH[2013/29]
English:ANTI-ALLERGY ACTIVITIES OF ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH[2013/29]
French:ACTIVITÉS ANTI-ALLERGIQUES DU ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH[2013/29]
Former [2007/19]ANTIHYPERTENSIVE ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE UND ANTI-ALLERGIE-AKTIVITÄTEN VON ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH
Former [2007/19]ANTI-HYPERSENSITIVE INFLAMMATION AND ANTI-ALLERGY ACTIVITIES OF ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH
Former [2007/19]INFLAMMATION ANTI-HYPERSENSIBLE ET ACTIVITÉS ANTI-ALLERGIQUES DU ZINGIBER ZERUMBET (L.) SMITH
Entry into regional phase23.02.2007National basic fee paid 
23.02.2007Search fee paid 
23.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/19]
16.04.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
29.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2011Observations by third parties
13.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2013Fee for grant paid
07.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2008
Opposition(s)26.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  - OLIVEROS M B ET AL, PHARMACOGNOSTIC STUDIES ON ZINGIBER-ZERUMBET AND ITS PROPOSED VARIETY FAMILY ZINGIBERACEAE, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CRUDE DRUG RESEARCH, VOL. 20, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 141-153, (1982), ISSN 0167-7314, XP009099887 [X] 1-15 * page 141, paragraph L *
 [X]  - SOMCHIT M NHAREET ET AL, "Anti inflammatory property of ethanol and water extracts of Zingiber zerumbet", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, XX, XX, (20030601), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 0253-7613, pages 181 - 182, XP009099888 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MURAKAMI AKIRA ET AL, "Effects of selected food factors with chemopreventive properties on combined lipopolysaccharide- and interferon-gamma-induced IkappaB degradation in RAW264.7 macrophages.", CANCER LETTERS, (20030530), vol. 195, no. 1, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 17 - 25, XP009099883 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(03)00058-2
International search[X]US6264928
other   - "Habb-e- Taaoghon", TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/3756, XP003026880
    - MOHAMMAD SHAREEF KHAN, Ilaaj-al-Amraaz, (1921), page 328
    - "Laooq Zeeq", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/4330, XP003029047
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), page 663
    - "Chatni Barai Surfa", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/768, XP003029048
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), pages 135 - 136
    - "Arq Chob Chini", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/3410, XP003029049
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), pages 514 - 515
    - "Churan-7", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/706, XP003029050
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), page 126