Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1788945

EP1788945 - APPARATUS FOR THE EVALUATION OF ROTATIONAL X-RAY PROJECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/22]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GRASS, Michael
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6, 5656 AA
Eindhoven / NL
02 / RASCHE, Volker
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6, 5656 AA
Eindhoven / NL
 [2007/22]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2007/52]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2007/22]Schouten, Marcus Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date05774785.917.08.2005
[2007/22]
WO2005IB52714
Priority number, dateEP2004030054618.08.2004         Original published format: EP 04300546
[2007/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006018817
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1788945
Date:30.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/03
[2007/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK [2007/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON DREHENDEN RÖNTGENPROJEKTIONEN[2007/22]
English:APPARATUS FOR THE EVALUATION OF ROTATIONAL X-RAY PROJECTIONS[2007/22]
French:APPAREIL D'EVALUATION DE PROJECTIONS RADIOLOGIQUES ROTATOIRES[2007/22]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2007National basic fee paid 
19.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/22]
19.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/26]
04.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004101104  (AVINASH GOPAL B [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050] - [0052] *;
 [Y]  - VAN STRATEN MARCEL ET AL, "Removal of arterial wall calcifications in CT angiography by local subtraction", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (200305), vol. 30, no. 5, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 761 - 770, XP012012060 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 762, column 2, paragraph LAST *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1567271
by applicantUS4361901