Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1786655

EP1786655 - AIRBAG AND A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autoliv Development AB
Wallentinsvägen 22
447 83 Vårgårda / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AB
447 83 Vargarda / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HAUSER, Stefan
Viehbacher Weg 6
85778 Haimhausen / DE
02 / ZAURITZ, Ralf
Alpenblickstrasse 15
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
03 / WEYAND, Jürgen
Erlhausen 8
85258 Weichs / DE
04 / MIKSITS, Christian
Wolfskoben 84
58640 Iserlohn / DE
 [2007/21]
Representative(s)Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwälte Mayer Frank Schön Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date05774987.127.08.2005
[2007/21]
WO2005EP09260
Priority number, dateDE2004104220901.09.2004         Original published format: DE102004042209
DE2004104889806.10.2004         Original published format: DE102004048898
[2007/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006024472
Date:09.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1786655
Date:23.05.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006
[2007/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1786655
Date:14.04.2010
Language:DE
[2010/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/16
[2007/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GASSACK UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2007/21]
English:AIRBAG AND A MOTOR VEHICLE[2007/21]
French:SAC GONFLABLE ET VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2007/21]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2007National basic fee paid 
21.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/21]
24.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
31.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2009Fee for grant paid
05.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
TR14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
BG14.07.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
AT27.08.2010
LU27.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/47]BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
TR14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
AT27.08.2010
LU27.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
Former [2012/44]BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
AT27.08.2010
LU27.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
Former [2012/42]BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
AT27.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
HU15.10.2010
Former [2012/41]BG14.04.2010
CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
AT27.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2012/01]CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
AT27.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/35]CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/20]CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/16]CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
IT14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/12]CZ14.04.2010
DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
RO14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
SK14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/09]DK14.04.2010
EE14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
PT16.08.2010
Former [2011/07]DK14.04.2010
FI14.04.2010
IE14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
Former [2011/03]FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
PL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
Former [2011/01]FI14.04.2010
LT14.04.2010
LV14.04.2010
NL14.04.2010
SE14.04.2010
SI14.04.2010
GR15.07.2010
ES25.07.2010
IS14.08.2010
Former [2010/46]NL14.04.2010
ES25.07.2010
Former [2010/45]NL14.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US3887213  (GOETZ ET AL) [X] 1,4-10,12-15 * column 3, line 10 - line 46; figures 1,3-6 *;
 [X]US2003020268  (REITER FRIEDRICH ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]EP0700808  (TAKATA, INC) [X] 1,9,16 * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 34; figures 8,9 *;
 [X]JP2002079905
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002079905 A 20020319 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract *