EP1754207 - DEVICE FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION FROM SENSORS AND/OR INTENDED FOR ACTUATORS TRIGGERING A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jarry, Luc 30, rue de la Mérantaise F-78960 Voisins Le Bretonneux / FR | For all designated states Prusker, Francis 25 résidence La Gaillarderie 78590 Noisy Le Roi / FR | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/08] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 05775269.3 | 02.06.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005FR01362 | Priority number, date | FR20040006217 | 08.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406217 | [2007/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006003279 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754207 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754207 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/02, A61B5/22, A63B24/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP);
A63B24/00 (EP);
A61B5/0022 (EP);
A61B5/024 (EP);
A61B5/224 (EP);
A63B2230/00 (EP);
G08C2201/93 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON INFORMATIONEN AUS SENSOREN UND/ODER FÜR AKTUATOREN ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINES MOBILFUNKTELEFONS | [2007/08] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION FROM SENSORS AND/OR INTENDED FOR ACTUATORS TRIGGERING A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE | [2007/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ISSUES DE CAPTEURS ET/OU DESTINEES A DES ACTIONNEURS FAISANT INTERVENIR UN RADIOTELEPHONE MOBILE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IE | 12.08.2009 | IT | 12.08.2009 | LT | 12.08.2009 | NL | 12.08.2009 | PL | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | IS | 12.12.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
PL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6171218 (SHEA MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO0141408 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 7-21 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 5 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO0209404 (ELET3 S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 9 * * page 3, line 29 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 32 * * page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 30 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 12 * * claims 1-14 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2004002634 (NIHTILA JUKKA [FI]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * * paragraph [0069] * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1-46 * |