Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1791579

EP1791579 - MEMBRANE PUMP WITH BLEED VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2010
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medela Holding AG
Lättichstrasse 4b
6340 Baar / CH
[2007/23]
Inventor(s)01 / STUTZ, Alex
Gartenstrasse 15
CH-6340 Baar / CH
02 / PFENNIGER, Erich
Obfalken 23
CH-6030 Ebikon / CH
03 / WEBER, Beda
Rigiweg 19b
CH-5643 Sins / CH
 [2007/46]
Former [2007/37]01 / STUTZ, Alex
Gartenstrasse 15
CH-6340 Baar / CH
02 / PFENNINGER, Erich
Obfalken 23
CH-6030 Ebikon / CH
03 / WEBER, Beda
Rigiweg 19b
CH-5643 Sins / CH
Former [2007/23]01 / STUTZ, Alex
Gartenstrasse 15
CH-6340 Baar / CH
02 / PFENNIGER, Erich
Obfalken 23
CH-6030 Ebikon / CH
03 / WEBER, Beda
Rigiweg 19b
CH-5643 Sins / CH
Representative(s)Clerc, Natalia
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Clerc, Natalia
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Former [2007/23]Clerc, Natalia
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940
CH-8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date05775800.506.09.2005
[2007/23]
WO2005CH00529
Priority number, dateCH2004000154120.09.2004         Original published format: CH 15412004
[2007/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006032156
Date:30.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1791579
Date:06.06.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006
[2007/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1791579
Date:08.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/06, F04B45/04, F04B49/03
[2007/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEMBRANPUME MIT ENTLÜFTUNGSVENTIL[2007/23]
English:MEMBRANE PUMP WITH BLEED VALVE[2007/23]
French:POMPE A MEMBRANE COMPORTANT UNE SOUPAPE DE VENTILATION[2007/23]
Entry into regional phase03.04.2007National basic fee paid 
03.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/23]
14.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2009Fee for grant paid
24.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09007901.3  / EP2105151
EP09007902.1  / EP2105152
Opposition(s)09.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.07.2009
CZ08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
SK08.07.2009
AT06.09.2009
LU06.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
GR09.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
HU09.01.2010
[2011/45]
Former [2011/32]CZ08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
SK08.07.2009
AT06.09.2009
LU06.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
GR09.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
HU09.01.2010
Former [2011/22]CZ08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
SK08.07.2009
AT06.09.2009
LU06.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
GR09.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2011/01]CZ08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
SK08.07.2009
AT06.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
GR09.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2010/40]CZ08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
SK08.07.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2010/24]CZ08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
SK08.07.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2010/20]DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
FI08.07.2009
IE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2010/17]FI08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2010/16]FI08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
IS08.11.2009
PT09.11.2009
Former [2010/12]FI08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
NL08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
IS08.11.2009
Former [2009/52]SI08.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US6090065  (GILES JOHN P [US]) [A] 1,2,5-7,10,18,19,21,22,24,27,28 * abstract * * column 6, line 28 - column 8, line 1 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP1221319  (MEDELA AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,5,7,19,24,28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6355012  (NUEESCH HEINRICH [CH]) [A] 1,2,5,19,28 * column 1, line 62 - column 4, line 49 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4865525  (KERN HANS [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7,10,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 38 * * figure - *;
 [XA]US4886494  (MORIFUJI YASUO [JP]) [X] 19 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - column 11, line 5 * * figures 1-13 * [A] 1,5,20-23,26,27;
 [A]US4583970  (KIRCHNER HANSJOERG [DE]) [A] 1,5,19 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 23 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US1847658  (EDWARD LASKER) [A] 1,5,19,28 * the whole document * * figure - *;
 [A]WO0041745  (TAGGART MEDO ELENA [US]) [A] 1,5,19,28 * abstract * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO03057276  (PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,19,28 * abstract * * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 6 * * figure 9 *