Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1771315

EP1771315 - MODULAR LUMBAR SUPPORT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L&P Property Management Company
4095 Firestone Boulevard
South Gate, CA 90280 / US
[2008/50]
Former [2007/15]For all designated states
L&P Property Management Company
4095 Firestone Boulevard
South Gate CA 90280 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COLJA, Renato
4265 Mount Sinai Cres
Windsor, Ontario N9G 2G7 / CA
02 / CERTOSSI, Stephen
293 St. Peters Street
Belle River, Ontario N0R 1A0 / CA
03 / BLENDEA, Horia
596 Vandernoot Avenue
LaSalle, Ontario N9H 3P7 / CA
04 / MITEA, Iulian
1439 Mickaila Cres
Windsor, Ontario N8N 4Z2 / CA
05 / MCMILLEN, Robert
2084 Lesperance Road
Tecumseh, Ontario N8N 2N4 / CA
 [2007/15]
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/15]Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date05777575.129.07.2005
[2007/15]
WO2005US27051
Priority number, dateUS20040592891P30.07.2004         Original published format: US 592891 P
[2007/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006015247
Date:09.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1771315
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006
[2007/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1771315
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/66, A47C7/46
[2007/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODULARE LUMBALSTÜTZVORRICHTUNG[2007/15]
English:MODULAR LUMBAR SUPPORT APPARATUS[2007/15]
French:SUPPORT LOMBAIRE MODULAIRE[2007/15]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2007National basic fee paid 
01.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/15]
21.03.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2008Fee for grant paid
27.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200703   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CY10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IT10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
TR10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
HU11.06.2009
GB29.07.2009
IE29.07.2009
LU29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IT10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
HU11.06.2009
GB29.07.2009
IE29.07.2009
LU29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/22]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IT10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
GB29.07.2009
IE29.07.2009
LU29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/16]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IT10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
GB29.07.2009
IE29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/01]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
GB29.07.2009
IE29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/40]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
GB29.07.2009
IE29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/25]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
GB29.07.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/24]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
CH31.07.2009
FR31.07.2009
LI31.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/12]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2009/52]AT10.12.2008
BE10.12.2008
CZ10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
EE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
RO10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
SK10.12.2008
BG10.03.2009
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
IS10.04.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/32]BE10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
Former [2009/27]FI10.12.2008
LT10.12.2008
LV10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
PL10.12.2008
SI10.12.2008
Former [2009/21]LT10.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003085600  (MORI MASATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figures 8-10 *;
 [A]US4834455  (PROCTOR JOY E [US]) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 50 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 36; figures 1,3,5-7 *;
 [A]WO9425307  (AMEU MANAGEMENT CORP [PA], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 34; figures 1,2 *