Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1737573

EP1737573 - INTEGRATION OF SAMPLE STORAGE AND SAMPLE MANAGEMENT FOR LIFE SCIENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2016Change - refusalpublished on 25.01.2017  [2017/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomatrica, Inc.
2568 Del Mar Heights Road - Suite 522
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
[2007/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HERRNSTADT, Corinna
3628 Ruette De Ville
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / MULLER, Rolf
12744 Via Donada
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
03 / MULLER-COHN, Judy
12744 Via Donada
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
 [2007/01]
Representative(s)Thornton, Neil
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]Thornton, Neil
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date05778182.508.04.2005
[2007/01]
WO2005US12084
Priority number, dateUS20040560829P08.04.2004         Original published format: US 560829 P
[2007/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005113147
Date:01.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1737573
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, C12Q1/68, G01S13/00, G06K19/07
[2007/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTEGRATION VON PROBENLAGERUNG UND PROBENVERWALTUNG FÜR BIOWISSENSCHAFTEN[2007/01]
English:INTEGRATION OF SAMPLE STORAGE AND SAMPLE MANAGEMENT FOR LIFE SCIENCE[2007/01]
French:INTEGRATION DU STOCKAGE ET DE LA GESTION D'ECHANTILLONS POUR LES SCIENCES DE LA VIE[2007/01]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2006National basic fee paid 
07.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/01]
09.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/03]
16.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
18.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/03]
18.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/04]
18.01.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.10.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/04]
Appeal following examination27.03.2013Appeal received No.  T1265/13
28.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
26.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
26.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP16194801.3  / EP3167961
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.04.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
24.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2003215369  (EGGERS MITCHELL D ET AL) [X] 1,2,8-37,54 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0012] - [0043] - [0045] - [0050] - [0057] - [0063] , [0073] , [0074] , [0077] , [0098] , [0120] , [0121] * * figures 1,2,8,9 * [Y] 38-41;
 [X]US5918273  (HORN ET AL) [X] 1,2,9-18,20-37,54 * abstract * * column 1, lines 9-26 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 58 * * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 14 * * column 11, line 43 - column 12, line 59 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 3 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [X]WO0020117  (CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED; CORLESS, ANTHONY, ROBERT) [X] 1,2,9-18,20-37,54 * abstract * * page 1, lines 8-10 * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, lines 3-5 * * page 5, lines 1-11 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 28 * * figures 1,3,4,6 *;
 [AY]US6294203  (BURGOYNE LEIGH ALEXANDER) [A] 1,2,8-37,54 * abstract * * column 1, lines 18-23 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 6 * * column 6, lines 24-51 * * example 2 * [Y] 38-41;
 [A]WO8701206  (HARGREAVES, WILLIAM, RUDOLPH) [A] 1,2,8-37,54 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-14 * * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 6 * * page 21, line 34 - page 22, line 31 * * page 24, lines 6-11 * * page 25, line 3 - page 26, line 4 * * page 26, line 30 - page 27, line 13 * * page 28, line 1 - page 29, line 13 * * example 3 * * figure 2 *;
 [PX]US2004208792  (LINTON JOHN ET AL) [PX] 1,2,8-37 * the whole document *;
 [PX]US2004121432  (KLEIN JENS ET AL) [PX] 1,2,9-18,20-37,54 * the whole document *