Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1912845

EP1912845 - CRANE RETURN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2010
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mhe Technologies, Inc.
3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3000
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
[2008/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WAISANEN, Steven, K.
S75 W23860 Vernon Hills Drive
Big Bend, WI 53103 / US
 [2008/17]
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2008/17]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date05778479.501.08.2005
[2008/17]
WO2005US27282
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007015693
Date:08.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1912845
Date:23.04.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007
[2008/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1912845
Date:28.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.02.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B61D1/00, B66C9/14
[2009/07]
Former International [2008/17]B61D1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KRANRÜCKFÜHRUNG[2008/17]
English:CRANE RETURN[2008/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE RENVOI POUR GRUE[2008/17]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2008National basic fee paid 
03.03.2008Search fee paid 
03.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/17]
23.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2009Fee for grant paid
19.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
NL28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
TR28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
NL28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
HU29.04.2010
Former [2011/16]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
IT28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2011/01]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
GR29.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/40]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
CZ28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
EE28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
RO28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
SK28.10.2009
BG28.01.2010
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/29]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/25]CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
LV28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/24]FI28.10.2009
LT28.10.2009
PL28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
SI28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/21]LT28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
ES08.02.2010
IS28.02.2010
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/19]ES08.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US3835617  (STOCK A, et al) [A] 1,10,20 * column 36, paragraph 1; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2004026349  (COLGATE J EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1,10,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4836111  (KAUFMANN KARL-ERNST [DE]) [A] 1,10,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4730743  (ROSMAN ALAN H [US]) [A] 1,10,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4635802  (HYLTON DOUGLAS W [US]) [A] 1,10,20 * the whole document *
International search[A]US4635802  (HYLTON DOUGLAS W [US]);
 [A]US4730743  (ROSMAN ALAN H [US]);
 [A]US4836111  (KAUFMANN KARL-ERNST [DE]);
 [A]US2004026349  (COLGATE J EDWARD [US], et al)