Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1787226

EP1787226 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REORGANIZING A DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CA, Inc.
520 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2017/18]
Former [2009/49]For all designated states
Computer Associates Think, Inc.
1 Computer Associates Plaza
Islandia, NY 11749 / US
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
Computer Associates Think, Inc.
1 Corporate Associates Plaza
Islandia, New York 11749 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHUMA, Kevin, P.
7784 CR 206
Celina, TX 75009 / US
02 / LYNN, Joseph, B.
4523 Aspen Glen Road
Plano, TX 75024 / US
 [2007/21]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date05779187.302.08.2005
[2007/21]
WO2005US27294
Priority number, dateUS20040601380P13.08.2004         Original published format: US 601380 P
US2005012537709.05.2005         Original published format: US 125377
[2007/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006020449
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1787226
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2007/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM UMORGANISIEREN EINER DATENBANK[2007/21]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REORGANIZING A DATABASE[2007/21]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REORGANISATION D'UNE BASE DE DONNEES[2007/21]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2007National basic fee paid 
13.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/21]
03.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.09.2013
11.09.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1517/17
26.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.12.2013Appeal received No.  T2008/14
04.02.2014Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2014Interlocutory revision of appeal
16.03.2015Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Cited inInternational search[X]US6223182  (AGARWAL NIPUN ET AL) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - line 67 * * column 8, line 8 - column 10, line 47; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US6606626  (PONNEKANTI NAGAVAMSI) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * column 12, line 24 - column 14, line 43 * * column 17, line 28 - column 18, line 2 *;
 [A]US6349310  (KLEIN JOHANNES ET AL) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * column 14, line 42 - column 16, line 34 *