Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1778353

EP1778353 - RADIOTHERAPEUTIC TREATMENT PLAN ADAPTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/18]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BAL, Matthieu
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / SPIES, Lothar
Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
03 / MCNUTT, Todd, R.
595 Miner Road
Cleveland, OH 44143 / US
 [2007/18]
Representative(s)Claveau, Olivier , et al
Société Civile SPID
33, rue de Verdun
92150 Suresnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/13]Claveau, Olivier , et al
Société Civile SPID 33, rue de Verdun BP 313
F-92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR
Former [2007/18]Schouten, Marcus Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date05779771.428.07.2005
[2007/18]
WO2005IB52554
Priority number, dateUS20040601288P13.08.2004         Original published format: US 601288 P
[2007/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006018761
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1778353
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1778353
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/00, G06K9/00
[2007/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/18]
TitleGerman:ADAPTION VON STRAHLENTHERAPIEBEHANDLUNGSPLÄNEN[2007/18]
English:RADIOTHERAPEUTIC TREATMENT PLAN ADAPTATION[2007/18]
French:ADAPTATION DE PLAN D'UN TRAITEMENT RADIOTHERAPEUTIQUE[2007/18]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2007National basic fee paid 
13.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/18]
20.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2012Fee for grant paid
27.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.05.2013  01.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
RaySearch Laboratories AB
Sveav. 25
11134 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Herbjørnsen, Rut
Trona Patentrådgivning AB
Rosterigränd 4
117 61 Stockholm / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/02]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2013  01.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
RaySearch Laboratories AB
Sveav. 25
11134 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Herbjørnsen, Rut
Trona Patentrådgivning AB
Box 102
129 22 Hägersten / SE
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2013   
RaySearch Laboratories AB
Sveav. 25
11134 Stockholm / SE
23.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.05.2015Appeal received No.  T0960/15
17.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
11.05.2015Appeal received No.  T0960/15
17.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
22.06.2011Request for further processing filed
22.06.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.07.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.07.2005
AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
GB28.07.2013
IE28.07.2013
LU28.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
GB28.07.2013
IE28.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
GB28.07.2013
IE28.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/21]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
GB28.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/23]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/22]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/20]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
Former [2013/09]FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
Former [2013/08]LT12.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002122530  (ERBEL STEPHAN ET AL) [X] 1,5,10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0014]; claims 1,10 *;
 [X]US5531520  (GRIMSON ET AL) [X] 11,12 * abstract *;
 [XA]  - DI YAN ET AL, "Adaptive radiation therapy", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS LTD. LONDON, GB, (1997), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 123 - 132, XP002315745 [X] 1-5 * page 123 - page 129 * [A] 6-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/42/1/008
 [X]  - BIRKNER M ET AL, "Adapting inverse planning to patient and organ geometrical variation: algorithm and implementation", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (200310), vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 2822 - 2831, XP012011966 [X] 1 * page 2822 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1610751
 [A]  - BROCK K K ET AL, "Inclusion of organ deformation in dose calculations", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (200303), vol. 30, no. 3, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 290 - 295, XP012011997 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1539039
 [A]  - LIANG J ET AL, "Reducing uncertainties in volumetric image based deformable organ registration", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (200308), vol. 30, no. 8, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 2116 - 2122, XP012012189 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1587631