Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1773950

EP1773950 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PIGMENTARY PARTICLES THAT ARE SELF-BINDING, DRY, OR IN AN AQUEOUS SUSPENSION OR DISPERSION, AND CONTAIN INORGANIC MATERIALS AND BINDING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omya International AG
Baslerstrasse 42
4665 Oftringen / CH
[2013/42]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG
Baslerstrasse 42
4665 Oftringen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GANE, Patrick
Studenweg 8
CH-4852 Rothrist / CH
02 / SCHOELKOPF, Joachim
Buechbühlstrasse 3
CH-8956 Killwangen / CH
 [2007/16]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Richebourg, Michel François
Cabinet Michel Richebourg
"Le Clos du Golf"
69, rue Saint-Simon
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
Former [2007/16]Richebourg, Michel François
Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
Application number, filing date05781733.012.07.2005
[2007/16]
WO2005IB02762
Priority number, dateFR2004000780613.07.2004         Original published format: FR 0407806
[2007/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006008657
Date:26.01.2006
Language:FR
[2006/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1773950
Date:18.04.2007
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006
[2007/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1773950
Date:25.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:C09C3/04, C09C3/00, C09C3/08, C09C1/02
[2014/04]
Former International [2007/16]C09C3/08, C09C1/02, C09C3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/16]
Extension statesAL13.02.2007
BA13.02.2007
HR13.02.2007
MK13.02.2007
YU13.02.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIGMENTPARTIKELN, DIE SELBSTBINDEND, TROCKEN ODER IN EINER WÄSSRIGEN SUSPENSION ODER DISPERSION SIND UND ANORGANISCHE MATERIALEN UND BINDUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEN[2014/08]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING PIGMENTARY PARTICLES THAT ARE SELF-BINDING, DRY, OR IN AN AQUEOUS SUSPENSION OR DISPERSION, AND CONTAIN INORGANIC MATERIALS AND BINDING AGENTS[2007/16]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULES PIGMENTAIRES AUTO-LIANTES, SECHES OU EN SUSPENSION OU DISPERSION AQUEUSES, CONTENANT DES MATIERES INORGANIQUES ET DES LIANTS[2007/16]
Former [2007/16]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIGMENTPARTIKELN, DIE SELBSTBINDEND, TROCKEN ODER IN EINER WÄSSRIGEN SUSPENSION ODER DISPERSION SIND UND ANORGANISCHE MATERIALIEN UND BINDUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEN
Entry into regional phase13.02.2007National basic fee paid 
13.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
08.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2014Fee for grant paid
02.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.2015  20.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 02  24.03.2015  20.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schaefer Kalk GmbH & Co. KG
Louise-Seher-Strasse 6
65582 Diez / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai Dörr Besier European Patent Attorneys, et al
European Trademark Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/48]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2015  20.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 02  24.03.2015  20.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schaefer Kalk GmbH & Co. KG
Louise-Seher-Strasse 6
65582 Diez / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai, Dörr, Besier, et al
Patentanwälte
Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2015/18]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2015   
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
 02  24.03.2015   
Schaefer Kalk GmbH & Co. KG
Louise-Seher-Strasse 6
65582 Diez / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai, Dörr, Besier, et al
Patentanwälte
Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
28.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition24.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1008/17
05.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
LU12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
CZ12.07.2018
SK12.07.2018
SE13.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
DK31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
PT14.01.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/26]HU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
LU12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
CZ12.07.2018
SK12.07.2018
SE13.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
PT14.01.2019
Former [2019/24]HU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
LU12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
CZ12.07.2018
SK12.07.2018
SE13.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/22]HU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
LU12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
CZ12.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/21]HU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
LU12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2016/33]HU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
LU12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU12.07.2005
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2016/25]BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/37]CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
IE12.07.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/18]CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY25.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[DXA]WO03074786  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DX] 21-31 * page 2, line 27 - line 31 * * page 3, line 12 - line 25 * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 26 * [A] 1-20;
 [A]WO2004041882  (OMYA AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims 21-26 * * page 44, line 21 - line 27; example 1 *;
 [AX]US5318624  (CORBIN DOUGLAS D [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * [X] 21-31;
 [AX]FR2818165  (COATEX SAS [FR]) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 19 - line 29 * * page 11, line 9 - page 14, line 3 * [X] 21-31;
 [XA]EP1167475  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-5,21-31 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 6-20
by applicantWO0100712
 WO0100713
 WO9311183
 WO9312183
 WO03074786
 FR2818165
 EP1167465
 US5318624
 WO2004041822
 US4025483
    - "Physical and chemical modifications in latex binders and their effect on the coating colour rheology", ADVANCED COATING FUNDAMENTALS SYMPOSIUM, (20010504), pages 108 - 123
    - "Modified calcium carbonate coatings with rapid absorption and extensive liquid update capacity", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A, (2003), vol. 236, no. 1-3, pages 91 - 102
    - "Fluid transport into porous coating structures : some novel findings", TAPPI JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 83, no. 5, pages 77 - 78