Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1887110

EP1887110 - SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL MANUFACTURING METHOD AND SILICON WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.06.2013  [2013/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMCO Corporation
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
[2008/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ONO, Toshiaki, c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1058634 / JP
02 / SUGIMURA, Wataru, c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1058634 / JP
03 / HOURAI, Masataka, c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1058634 / JP
 [2012/29]
Former [2008/07]01 / ONO, Toshiaki, c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1058634 / JP
02 / SUGIMURA, Wataru, c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1058634 / JP
03 / HOURAI, Masataka, c/o SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1058634 / JP
Representative(s)Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/29]Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2008/07]Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date05783532.414.09.2005
[2008/07]
WO2005JP16962
Priority number, dateJP2005011283608.04.2005         Original published format: JP 2005112836
JP2005020410213.07.2005         Original published format: JP 2005204102
[2008/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006112054
Date:26.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1887110
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006
[2008/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1887110
Date:18.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.10.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C30B29/06, C30B15/04, C30B15/20
[2012/03]
Former International [2008/07]C30B29/06
Designated contracting statesDE [2008/29]
Former [2008/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SILICIUMEINKRISTALLEN UND SILICIUMWAFER[2008/07]
English:SILICON SINGLE CRYSTAL MANUFACTURING METHOD AND SILICON WAFER[2008/07]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MONOCRISTAL DE SILICIUM ET PLAQUE EN SILICIUM[2008/07]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2007Translation filed 
07.11.2007National basic fee paid 
07.11.2007Search fee paid 
07.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
09.11.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.02.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2012Fee for grant paid
01.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09008456.7  / EP2110466
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2012
Opposition(s)19.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2001023941  (AMMON WILFRIED VON [AT], et al) [X] 1,7,9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0013] , [0015] * [Y] 2-6;
 [XY]EP1229155  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 7-9 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0057] * [Y] 2-6;
 [X]US2002142170  (ASAYAMA EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 7-9 * claims 5,8 *;
 [X]US2001029883  (MINAMI TOSHIROU [JP], et al) [X] 7-9 * claims 8,9 *;
 [E]EP1598452  (SUMITOMO MITSUBISHI SILICON [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0081] *;
 [A]US2002081440  (MURAKAMI HIROKI [JP], et al);
 [A]JPS61178495  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003175532  (ASAYAMA EIICHI [JP], et al)
International search[X]JP2005060153  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK);
 [Y]WO2004083496  (SUMITOMO MITSUBISHI SILICON [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2001274165  (WACKER NSCE CORP);
 [Y]JP2002187794  (SUMITOMO METAL IND);
 [A]JP2001226195  (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO);
 [A]JPH11302099  (SUMITOMO METAL IND)