Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1791683

EP1791683 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRODUCTS BASED ON WOOD POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/23]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING PRODUCTS BASED ON WOOD POWDER
[2012/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L3F Sweden AB
Karshult 2
545 93 Töreboda / SE
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]For all designated states
EDVINSSON, Jerry
Karlshult Pl 9563
545-93 Töreboda / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Edvinsson, Jerry
Karlshult Pl. 9563
545 93 Töreboda / SE
 [2008/18]
Former [2007/23]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2007/23]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date05783838.519.09.2005
[2007/23]
WO2005SE01367
Priority number, dateSE2004000227520.09.2004         Original published format: SE 0402275
[2007/23]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006033621
Date:30.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1791683
Date:06.06.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006
[2007/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1791683
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.03.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/00, B27N5/00
[2011/31]
Former International [2007/23]B27N5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRODUKTEN AUF HOLZPULVERBASIS[2012/45]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRODUCTS BASED ON WOOD POWDER[2012/45]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS A BASE DE POUDRE DE BOIS[2007/23]
Former [2007/23]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRODUKTEN AUF HOLZPULVERBASIS
Former [2007/23]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING PRODUCTS BASED ON WOOD POWDER
Entry into regional phase30.03.2006Translation filed 
12.03.2007National basic fee paid 
12.03.2007Search fee paid 
12.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/23]
19.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2013Fee for grant paid
04.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.12.2013   
voxeljet AG
Paul-Lenz-Str. 1
86316 Friedberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Helbig, Christian
Wagner + Helbig Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14
80538 München / DE
 [2014/04]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition01.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0256/16
08.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
18.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.09.2005
AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
IE19.09.2013
LU19.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/34]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
IE19.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
IE19.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
MC13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
DK13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
CY13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
RO13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
SK13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT13.03.2013
BE13.03.2013
EE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
IS13.07.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/47]BE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
PT15.07.2013
Former [2013/44]BE13.03.2013
FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/38]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
LV13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI13.03.2013
LT13.03.2013
SI13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
GR14.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT13.03.2013
BG13.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT13.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0134371  (CORP Z [US]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,14,19-22 * page 21, line 3; claim - * [Y] 3;
 [Y]EP0431924  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 3 * column 4, lines 28-34 *
International search[A]US3655098  (SCHNITZLER ULRICH);
 [A]US6007318  (RUSSELL DAVID B [US], et al);
 [A]US6375874  (RUSSELL DAVID B [US], et al);
 [A]EP0426363  (STRATASYS INC [US])