Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1786920

EP1786920 - MODULAR COMPOSITING-MULTIPLE LOT SCREENING PROTOCOLS FOR DETECTION OF PATHOGENS, MICROBIAL CONTAMINANTS AND/OR CONSTITUENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.04.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute for Environmental Health, Inc.
15300 Bothell Way NE
Lake Forest Park, WA 98155 / US
[2007/21]
Inventor(s)01 / SAMADPOUR, Mansour
6050 50th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98155 / US
 [2007/21]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/17]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2011/16]Raggers, René John , et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2007/21]Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date05783958.108.08.2005
[2007/21]
WO2005US28161
Priority number, dateUS20040599473P06.08.2004         Original published format: US 599473 P
[2007/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006017832
Date:16.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1786920
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006
[2007/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1786920
Date:05.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/04
[2008/28]
Former International [2008/06]C12Q1/18
Former International [2007/21]C12Q1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/21]
Extension statesAL16.02.2007
BA16.02.2007
HR16.02.2007
MK16.02.2007
YU16.02.2007
TitleGerman:SCREENING-PROTOKOLLE MIT MODULARER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND MEHREREN CHARGEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON KRANKHEITSERREGERN, MIKROBIELLEN VERUNREINIGUNGEN UND/ODER BESTANDTEILEN[2007/21]
English:MODULAR COMPOSITING-MULTIPLE LOT SCREENING PROTOCOLS FOR DETECTION OF PATHOGENS, MICROBIAL CONTAMINANTS AND/OR CONSTITUENTS[2007/21]
French:PROTOCOLES D'ANALYSE DE LOTS MULTIPLES A COMPOSITION MODULAIRE DESTINES A LA DETECTION DE PATHOGENES, D'IMPURETES ET/OU DE CONSTITUANTS BACTERIENS[2007/21]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2007National basic fee paid 
16.02.2007Search fee paid 
16.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/21]
18.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2008Observations by third parties
06.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2009Observations by third parties
09.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2010Observations by third parties
17.03.2010Fee for grant paid
17.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10161897.3  / EP2230313
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.02.2011  14.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
bioMérieux Inc.
100 Rodolphe Street
Durham, NC 27712 / US
Opponent's representative
Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/43]
Opponent(s)01  04.02.2011  14.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
bioMérieux Inc.
100 Rodolphe Street
Durham, NC 27712 / US
Opponent's representative
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2011/11]
Opponent(s)01  04.02.2011   
bioMérieux Inc.
100 Rodolphe Street
Durham, NC 27712 / US
Opponent's representative
Marchant, Michael John
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow
Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB
24.03.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.09.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.02.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0662/14
24.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
12.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
LU08.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
IE08.08.2016
IT08.08.2016
SE09.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NL01.09.2016
[2017/41]
Former [2017/31]CZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
LU08.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
SE09.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
NL01.09.2016
Former [2017/23]CZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
LU08.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
SE09.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
LU08.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
BE31.08.2016
Former [2013/42]CZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
LU08.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
Former [2011/16]CZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
Former [2011/12]CZ05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
Former [2011/09]EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
Former [2011/03]FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
CY12.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
Former [2011/01]FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]  - ROHLF F JAMES ET AL, "Optimizing composite sampling protocols", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 0013-936X, pages 2899 - 2905, XP002481131 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es950733x
International search[X]  - SAMADPOUR M. ET AL., "Laboratory Investigation of an E. coli O157:H7 Outbreak Associated with Swimming in Battle Ground Lake, Vancouver, Washington", JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH, (200206), vol. 64, no. 10, pages 16 - 20, XP008091842
 [X]  - RENTER D.G. ET AL., "Diversity, Frequency, and Persistence of Escherichia coli O157 Strains from Range Cattle Environments", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200301), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 542 - 547, XP003022420

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.1.542-547.2003
other   - PRICE W.R., "Salmonella testing of Pooled pre-Enrichement broth cultures for screening multiple food samples", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (197204), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 679 - 682, XP003021133
    - SILLIKER J.H. AND D.A. GABIS, "ICMSF methods studies. I. Comparison of analytical schemes for detection of Salmonella in dried foods", CAN. J. MICROBIOL., (19721214), vol. 19, pages 475 - 479, XP003021134
    - THOMAS R.J., "Examination of Stockfeeds for Salmonella", AUSTRALIAN VETERINARY JOURNAL, (198102), vol. 57, pages 69 - 71, XP003025914

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-0813.1981.tb00447.x