Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1786920 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1786920



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1544
03.12.2019 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
22.11.2019 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
07.10.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.10.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.10.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.09.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.09.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
26.09.2019 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.09.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.04.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
11.04.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Opposition 24
11.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.03.2019 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
08.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.02.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.01.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
28.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.01.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
18.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.01.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.08.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
08.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.08.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.07.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.01.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
16.11.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
09.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.11.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.11.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.11.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Appeal 1
01.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.11.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.09.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
20.09.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
31.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.12.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.12.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.11.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
16.11.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.11.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
27.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
27.10.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
27.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
27.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
06.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.01.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 2
12.01.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 10
12.01.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 26
12.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 3
12.01.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 18
12.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 3
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 5
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 28
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 33
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 4
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 3
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 11
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 7
12.01.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 10
12.01.2015 Notice of opposition Appeal 20
12.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 26
12.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 17
12.01.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
27.10.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.10.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 1
21.10.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
30.06.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.06.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 28
24.06.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 223
24.06.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 5
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Claims Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.06.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.06.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
08.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.03.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.03.2014 General authorisation Appeal 1
26.03.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.03.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
24.03.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
24.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
24.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2014 General authorisation Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.03.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
07.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.02.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.02.2014 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
14.02.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
14.02.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
13.02.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.01.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
14.11.2013 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Claims Opposition 3
14.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 33
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 131
14.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 5
14.11.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.11.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
16.09.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
20.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
29.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Annex Opposition 4
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 3
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 3
26.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
11.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.03.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.03.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.03.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.03.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
17.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
04.02.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
04.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
04.02.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
09.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
17.03.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.01.2010 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
27.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 5
21.01.2010 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
12.01.2010 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
09.11.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.11.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
09.11.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.11.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
03.07.2009 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
25.06.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
13.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
10.02.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 5
22.09.2008 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 4
22.09.2008 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
16.07.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
30.06.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.06.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 1
11.06.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.02.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.02.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.02.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
08.01.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
29.11.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
20.11.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
25.04.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.04.2007 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.04.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
16.02.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.02.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
20.12.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.03.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
16.02.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 26