Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1668384

EP1668384 - A range image sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.03.2008
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2015/34]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KURIHARA, Fumikazu
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8686 / JP
02 / TAKADA, Yuji
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
03 / HASHIMOTO, Yusuke
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
04 / TSUNESADA, Fumi
1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi
Osaka, 571-8686 / JP
 [2006/24]
Representative(s)Appelt, Christian W.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Appelt, Christian W.
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2006/24]Appelt, Christian W.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date05785265.916.09.2005
[2006/24]
WO2005JP17569
Priority number, dateJP2004027200017.09.2004         Original published format: JP 2004272000
JP2004027200117.09.2004         Original published format: JP 2004272001
[2006/32]
Former [2006/24]JP2000000272017.09.2004
JP27200117.09.2004
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006030989
Date:23.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1668384
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006
[2006/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1668384
Date:16.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/493, H01L27/148
[2006/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Reichweitenbildsensor[2006/24]
English:A range image sensor[2006/24]
French:Capteur d'images à gamme de longueur[2006/24]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2006National basic fee paid 
05.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
12.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2008Fee for grant paid
03.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2009  20.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
IEE International Electronics & Engineering S.A.
ZAE Wiergewan 11 Rue Edmond Reuter
5326 Contern / LU
Opponent's representative
Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
 [2013/33]
Former [2009/08]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2009   
IEE International Electronics & Engineering S.A.
ZAE Wiergewan 11 Rue Edmond Reuter
5326 Contern / LU
Opponent's representative
Bruck, Mathis
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48
L-8001 Strassen / LU
27.04.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
17.02.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.02.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
07.05.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition17.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1422/15
17.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
17.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1422/15
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
PT16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
GB16.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
IT16.09.2015
[2016/21]
Former [2015/38]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
PT16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
GB16.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
FR30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/36]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
PT16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
GB16.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
PT16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/21]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
PT16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
Former [2011/01]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
GR17.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
Former [2010/40]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
TR16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
HU17.10.2008
Former [2010/33]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
LU16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2010/01]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CY16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
IE16.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/22]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
EE16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/20]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/14]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
RO16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
Former [2009/13]AT16.04.2008
BE16.04.2008
CZ16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LT16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
SK16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
Former [2009/09]AT16.04.2008
DK16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
SE16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
Former [2009/05]AT16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
IS16.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT16.04.2008
FI16.04.2008
LV16.04.2008
NL16.04.2008
PL16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
Former [2008/48]NL16.04.2008
SI16.04.2008
BG16.07.2008
ES27.07.2008
Former [2008/44]SI16.04.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]US5856667  (SPIRIG ET AL) [A] 1 * column A; figure 4 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [A]US6373557  (MENGEL PETER ET AL) [A] 1 * column A * * column 5, line 49 - line 65 * * column 9, line 1 - line 24 *