Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1789798

EP1789798 - MARKERS FOR AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.06.2009  [2009/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xceed Molecular Corporation
1 Marmac Drive
Toronto ON M9W 1E7 / CA
[2007/22]
Inventor(s)01 / BARNES, Debra, A.
7301 Hilltop Court
Frederick, MD 21702 / US
02 / DEMPSEY, Adam
26 Olive Avenue LPH07
Toronto, Ontario M2N 7G7 / CA
 [2007/22]
Representative(s)Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/22]Brown, David Leslie
HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date05786543.812.08.2005
[2007/22]
WO2005US28801
Priority number, dateUS20040601109P13.08.2004         Original published format: US 601109 P
[2007/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006020899
Date:23.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1789798
Date:30.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006
[2007/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2008/09]
Former International [2007/22]G01N33/564
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MARKER FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN[2007/22]
English:MARKERS FOR AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE DETECTION[2007/22]
French:MARQUEURS POUR LA DÉTECTION DE MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES[2007/22]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2007National basic fee paid 
07.03.2007Search fee paid 
07.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/22]
04.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004046098  (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * claim 11 *;
 [X]US2003148298  (O' TOOLE MARGOT [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * discloses the use of IFIT3 and LY6E in marker compositions;; claim 19 *;
 [A]WO03072035  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * PR069599 = SEQ ID NO:1 *
 [X]  - CROW MARY K ET AL, "Microarray analysis of gene expression in lupus.", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH & THERAPY 2003, (2003), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 1478-6362, pages 279 - 287, XP002508586 [X] 1-25 * page 283, column R - page 285; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/AR1015
 [DX]  - CROW M K ET AL, "MICROARRAY ANALYSIS OF INTERFERON-REGULATED GENES IN SLE", AUTOIMMUNITY, HARWOOD, CHUR, CH, (20031201), vol. 36, no. 8, ISSN 0891-6934, pages 481 - 490, XP008029657 [DX] 1-25 * page 487 - page 488; tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08916930310001625952
 [X]  - AFFYMETRIX, "Affimetrix GeneChip Human Genome U133 Array Set HG-U133A", NCBI GEO,, (20020311), XP002355386 [X] 13-25 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2004033498  (BEHRENS TIMOTHY W [US], et al);
 [Y]US5830652  (KIMBERLY ROBERT P [US], et al)