Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1824380

EP1824380 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING AND PRESENTATION OF PHYSIOLOGICAL DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.08.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medicus Engineering ApS
c/o JC Skovbrynet 32
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2007/35]For all designated states
Medicus Engineering ApS
Gustav Wieds Vej 10
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Inventor(s)01 / FLEISCHER, Jesper
Miltonvej 3
DK-8270 Højbjerg / DK
02 / JENSEN, Martin, Snejbjerg
Thorvaldsensgade 30, 4. tv.
DK-8000 Århus C / DK
 [2007/38]
Former [2007/35]01 / FLEISCHER, Jesper
Miltonvej 3
DK-8270 Højbjerg / DK
02 / JENSEN, Martin, Snejbjerg
Marselis Boulavard 115, st.tv.
DK-8000 Århus C / DK
Representative(s)Zwicker, Jörk , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/24]Zwicker, Jörk , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Former [2008/37]Inspicos A/S
Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Former [2007/35]Inspicos A/S
Bøge Allé 5
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Application number, filing date05786636.027.09.2005
[2007/35]
WO2005DK00611
Priority number, dateDK2004000173410.11.2004         Original published format: DK 200401734
[2007/35]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006050725
Date:18.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1824380
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006
[2007/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/02, A61B5/024, A61B5/087, A61B5/0205, A61B5/0404
[2009/37]
Former International [2007/35]A61B5/02, A61B5/024
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG UND DARSTELLUNG VON PHYSIOLOGISCHEN DATEN[2007/35]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING AND PRESENTATION OF PHYSIOLOGICAL DATA[2007/35]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ENREGISTRER ET DE PRESENTER DES DONNEES PHYSIOLOGIQUES[2007/35]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2005Translation filed 
11.06.2007National basic fee paid 
11.06.2007Search fee paid 
11.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/35]
01.08.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.03.2015Appeal received No.  T1187/15
26.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
26.08.2010Request for further processing filed
26.08.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
30.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
28.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
26.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Cited inInternational search[X]US5183051  ;
 [X]US5865758  ;
 [X]WO9206633  ;
 [A]EP1103217  ;
 [A]EP0917069  ;
 [A]US5265615  ;
 [A]US4417586  ;
 [A]US2002022785
 [X]  - BARROS ET AL, "Heart instantaneous frquency (HIF): an alternative approach to extract heart rate variability", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIO-MEDICAL ENGINEERING, (200108), vol. 48, no. 8, pages 850 - 855, XP008117120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/10.936361
 [X]  - DE ANGELIS ET AL, "Exercise reverses peripheral insulin resistance in trained L-Name-hypertensive rats", HYPERTENSION, (199910), vol. 34, no. 4 PART 2, pages 768 - 772, XP008117123