Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1784262

EP1784262 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR APPLYING IMAGES TO A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/20]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAIRD, Richard, W.
19015 SE 269th Street
Covington, WA 98042 / US
02 / DALBY, Glenn, R.
17525 10th Ave. N.W.
Shoreline, WA 98177 / US
03 / POSTL, William, J.
22104 McMurray Shores Drive
Mount Vernon, WA 98274 / US
 [2007/36]
Former [2007/33]01 / BAIRD, Richard, W.
19015 SE 269th Street
Covington, WA 98042 / US
02 / DALBY, Glenn, R.
17525 10th Ave. N.W.
Shoreline, WA 98177 / US
03 / POSTL, William, J.
5026 Robe-Menzel Road
Granite Falls, WA 98252 / US
Former [2007/20]01 / BAIRD, Richard, W.
11017 S.E. 201st Place. No. L203
Kent, WA 98030 / US
02 / DALBY, Glenn, R.
17525 10th Ave. N.W.
Shoreline, WA 98177 / US
03 / POSTL, William, J.
5026 Robe-Menzel Road
Granite Falls, WA 98252 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2007/20]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date05788705.124.08.2005
[2007/20]
WO2005US29828
Priority number, dateUS2004092680126.08.2004         Original published format: US 926801
[2007/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006026240
Date:09.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1784262
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006
[2007/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1784262
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:B05B13/04, B41J3/407
[2007/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON BILDERN AUF EINER FLÄCHE[2007/20]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR APPLYING IMAGES TO A SURFACE[2007/20]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER DES IMAGES SUR UNE SURFACE[2007/20]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2007National basic fee paid 
20.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/20]
20.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2008Fee for grant paid
27.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)EP08014290.4  / EP1987889
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.05.2009  27.05.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Operations GmbH/Airbus Operations S.A.S/ Airbus Operations Ltd./Airbus Operations S.L./ Airbus S.A.S.
Kreetslag 10/316 Route de Bayonne/
New Filton House,Filton/Avda. de John Lennon s/n/
1 Rond Point Maurice Bellonte
21129 Hamburg(DE)/31060 Toulouse(FR)/, Bristol BS99 7A
31700 Blagnac Cedex(FR) / DE
Opponents representative
Isarpatent, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/15]
Opponent(s)01  12.05.2009  27.05.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Operations GmbH/Airbus Operations S.A.S/ Airbus Operations Ltd./Airbus Operations S.L./ Airbus S.A.S.
Kreetslag 10/316 Route de Bayonne/
New Filton House,Filton/Avda. de John Lennon s/n/
1 Rond Point Maurice Bellonte
21129 Hamburg(DE)/31060 Toulouse(FR)/, Bristol BS99 7A
31700 Blagnac Cedex(FR) / DE
Opponents representative
Isarpatent, et al
Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Former [2009/37]
Opponent(s)01  12.05.2009  27.05.2009  ADMISSIBLE
AIRBUS Deutschland GmbH/AIRBUS France SAS/AIRBUS UK Limited/AIRBUS España S.L./AIRBUS SAS
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Opponents representative
Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Former [2009/27]
Opponent(s)01  12.05.2009  27.05.2009  ADMISSIBLE
AIRBUS Deutschland GmbH/AIRBUS France SAS/AIRBUS UK Limited/AIRBUS España S.L./AIRBUS SAS
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Opponents representative
Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR, et al
Friedrichstraße 31
D-80801 München / DE
18.06.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.10.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
26.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition27.11.2015Appeal received No.  T2202/15
03.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
19.02.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/08]
03.03.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/10]
07.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
27.03.2008Request for further processing filed
27.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.07.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IT13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
IE24.08.2008
LU24.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
HU14.02.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
[2011/01]
Former [2010/40]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IT13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
IE24.08.2008
LU24.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
HU14.02.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
Former [2010/33]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IT13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE24.08.2008
LU24.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
Former [2010/24]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IT13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
PL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE24.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
Former [2010/12]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IT13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE24.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
SE13.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2010/01]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
EE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
IT13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
IE24.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/28]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CZ13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
RO13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
SK13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
BG13.11.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/19]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/18]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/14]AT13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
SI13.08.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/12]LT13.08.2008
LV13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
ES24.11.2008
IS13.12.2008
Former [2009/10]LT13.08.2008
NL13.08.2008
IS13.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[PX]FR2862563  (CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE CNRS; UNIVERSITE DE POITI) [PX] 1-3,8,13,19 * abstract *;
 [XY]US4920422  (LAPIERRE ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,13,19 * abstract * [Y] 29;
 [XY]US4864966  (ANDERSON ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,13,19 * abstract * [Y] 29;
 [XY]DE19634582  (POLYTRONIC GROSBILDKOMMUNIKATION KNOW HOW, TECHNIK UND SERVICE GMBH, 1) [X] 1-3,8,13,19 * abstract * [Y] 29;
 [XY]FR2601265  (CHERUBIN GRILLO VICTOR) [X] 1,19 * abstract * [Y] 29;
 [XY]JPH01133800
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 17, & JP01133800 A 19890525 (LAC:KK) [X] 1,19 * abstract * [Y] 29