Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1784262


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.08.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
09.08.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
04.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal
16.02.2016 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
03.02.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
30.11.2015 Change: Appeal number
30.11.2015 New entry: Appeal number
30.11.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
25.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
25.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.02.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2013 Change - representative published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
03.12.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
03.09.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2010  [2010/40]
16.07.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.08.2010  [2010/33]
14.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.06.2010  [2010/24]
19.02.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.03.2010  [2010/12]
27.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.12.2009  [2009/53]
27.10.2009 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.08.2009 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  09.09.2009  [2009/37]
14.07.2009 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
05.06.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.07.2009  [2009/28]
29.05.2009 Opposition filed published on  01.07.2009  [2009/27]
10.04.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.05.2009  [2009/20]
03.04.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.05.2009  [2009/19]
27.03.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2009  [2009/18]
20.03.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.04.2009  [2009/17]
13.03.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.04.2009  [2009/16]
06.03.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.04.2009  [2009/15]
27.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.04.2009  [2009/14]
13.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
30.01.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2009  [2009/10]
15.08.2008 Change - divisional application(s) published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
11.07.2008 (Expected) grant published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
04.07.2008 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
16.05.2008 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.04.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.04.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.11.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.11.2007 Change - extension states published on  05.12.2007  [2007/49]
24.10.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.09.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2007 Change - inventor published on  05.09.2007  [2007/36]
13.07.2007 Change - inventor published on  15.08.2007  [2007/33]
22.06.2007 First examination report
16.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.04.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.05.2007  [2007/20]
13.04.2007 Request for examination filed published on  16.05.2007  [2007/20]
12.04.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
24.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2005 PCT data prior to European publication