blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1792125

EP1792125 - INDUSTRIAL WATER TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIOTO Clear Energy AG
Solarstrasse 1
9300 St. Veit an der Glan / AT
[2010/47]
Former [2007/23]For all designated states
Uni-Block Produktions- und Vertriebs GmbH
Heideweg 4
2443 Loretto / AT
Inventor(s)01 / STRICKER, Erwin
Heideweg 4
2443 Loretto / AT
 [2010/48]
Former [2007/23]01 / STRICKER, Erwin
Heideweg 4
A-2443 Loretto / AT
Representative(s)Becker, Thomas, et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]Becker, Thomas, et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [2010/35]Becker, Thomas, et al
Becker & Kollegen Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [2007/23]Müllner, Martin, et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date05789514.621.09.2005
[2007/23]
WO2005EP54730
Priority number, dateAT2004000159122.09.2004         Original published format: AT 15912004
[2007/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2006032680
Date:30.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1792125
Date:06.06.2007
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1792125
Date:16.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.2006
ClassificationIPC:F24D3/08
[2007/23]
CPC:
F24D3/08 (EP); Y02B10/20 (EP); Y02B10/70 (EP);
Y02P80/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRAUCHWASSERBEREITER[2007/23]
English:INDUSTRIAL WATER TREATMENT DEVICE[2007/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PREPARATION D'EAU INDUSTRIELLE[2007/23]
Entry into regional phase02.04.2007National basic fee paid 
02.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/23]
10.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2011Fee for grant paid
25.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HU16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
PL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
TR16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
AT21.09.2011
LU21.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
PL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
TR16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
AT21.09.2011
LU21.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2013/25]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
PL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
AT21.09.2011
LU21.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2013/07]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
PL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
AT21.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/20]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
PL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/11]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
PL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2012/10]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/50]CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/47]CY16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
IE16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/37]CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
GR17.06.2011
ES27.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19702897  (LIMAX OEL GAS FERNWAERMETECHNI [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [AD]DE10032714  (SOLVIS SOLARSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.