Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1882101

EP1882101 - PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ixetic Hückeswagen GmbH
Industriestrasse 8
42499 Hückeswagen / DE
[2008/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HEIDEMEYER, Christoph
Greuel 3
42897 Remscheid / DE
 [2008/05]
Application number, filing date05791474.928.09.2005
[2008/05]
WO2005DE01718
Priority number, dateDE2004105147522.10.2004         Original published format: DE102004051475
[2008/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006042493
Date:27.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1882101
Date:30.01.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006
[2008/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1882101
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:F04C29/00
[2008/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/05]
TitleGerman:PUMPE[2008/05]
English:PUMP[2008/05]
French:POMPE[2008/05]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2007National basic fee paid 
11.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
11.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/05]
25.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
10.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2009Fee for grant paid
08.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.12.2007AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007BG   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007CY   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007CZ   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007EE   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007HU   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007IS   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007LT   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007LV   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007MC   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007PL   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007RO   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007SI   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007SK   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
11.12.2007TR   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.12.2007M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
AT28.09.2009
LU28.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
AT28.09.2009
LU28.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
AT28.09.2009
LU28.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/01]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
AT28.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/46]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
BE30.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/40]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/12]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/01]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]DE8509505U  (BARMAG BARMER MASCHINENFABRIK AG, 5630 REMSCHEID, DE) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 14 - line 28; figures 1,3a,3b *;
 [A]EP0745525  (LUK AUTOMOBILTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1361365  (LUK AUTOMOBILITECHNIK GMBH & C [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figures 13-17 *