Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1795797

EP1795797 - LED LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2014
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chan, Sze Keun
2301 Laurels Industrial Centre
32 Tai Yau Street
San Po Kong
Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
[2013/47]
Former [2007/24]For all designated states
Chan, Sze Keun
2301 Laurels Industrial Centre, 32 Tai Yau Street, San Po Kong Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/24]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Former [2009/42]Novagraaf IP
3 Avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Former [2007/24]Breese Derambure Majerowicz
38, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date05792098.526.09.2005
[2007/24]
WO2005CN01562
Priority number, dateCN200417839327.09.2004         Original published format: CN200410078393
[2007/24]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006034633
Date:06.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1795797
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006
[2007/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1795797
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.04.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:F21S4/00
[2007/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/24]
TitleGerman:LED-LAMPE[2007/24]
English:LED LAMP[2007/24]
French:LAMPE A DIODES ELECTROLUMINESCENTES (DEL)[2007/24]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2006Translation filed 
22.12.2006National basic fee paid 
22.12.2006Search fee paid 
22.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
22.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/24]
11.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.02.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2013Fee for grant paid
10.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination16.04.2010Appeal received No.  T1483/10
15.06.2010Statement of grounds filed
28.02.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2008
Opposition(s)21.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
07.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
25.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200703   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.09.2005
AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU26.09.2005
AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/31]AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/28]AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2016/25]AT20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/37]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/20]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
Former [2014/20]LT20.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003090910  (CHEN HSING [TW]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-24 *;
 [Y]WO0057490  (EUROLIGHT ILLUMINATION TECHNOL [CH]; SCHUHMACHER RALF [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 30; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2003103348  (HUNG SHENG-TIEN [TW]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4 *
International search[A]CN2637885Y  ;
 [A]CN2636073Y  ;
 [A]JP2001243809  ;
 [A]JP2001325809  ;
 [A]US6220722  ;
 [A]US2001014019