Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1792224

EP1792224 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS DESIGNED TO PRODUCE AN OPTICAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2012
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique)
147, rue de Paris
94227 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/23]For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique)
147, rue de Paris
94227 Charenton le Pont / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MOLITON, Renaud
147, rue de Paris
F-94227 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR
02 / CADO, Hervé
147, rue de Paris
F-94227 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR
03 / MARTIN, Gérard
147, rue de Paris
F-94227 CHARENTON-LE-PONT / FR
 [2007/23]
Representative(s)Lenne, Laurence , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Lenne, Laurence , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41 Rue Aristide Briand
92160 Antony / FR
Former [2007/23]Lenne, Laurence , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date05792104.112.07.2005
[2007/23]
WO2005FR50574
Priority number, dateFR2004000790216.07.2004         Original published format: FR 0407902
[2007/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006016086
Date:16.02.2006
Language:FR
[2006/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1792224
Date:06.06.2007
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006
[2007/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1792224
Date:07.09.2011
Language:FR
[2011/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/01, B29D11/00
[2007/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPHTHALMISCHEN LINSE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHEN ANZEIGE[2007/23]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS DESIGNED TO PRODUCE AN OPTICAL DISPLAY[2007/23]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE DESTINEE A LA REALISATION D'UN AFFICHEUR OPTIQUE[2007/23]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2007National basic fee paid 
10.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
10.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/23]
17.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2009Fee for grant paid
07.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2007
Opposition(s)11.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.04.2007AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007BG   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007CZ   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007EE   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007HU   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007IS   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007LT   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007LV   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007PL   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007RO   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007SI   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007SK   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
10.04.2007TR   M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
10.04.2007M01   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.07.2005
AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/35]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
Former [2012/20]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
Former [2012/08]LT07.09.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2002036751  (TANIJIRI YASUSHI ET AL) [X] 1,9,11 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] , [0064] - [0068] - [0087] - [0090] - [0092]; figures 2,6,13,16-22 * [Y] 2,6,7,10;
 [X]EP1385023  (C.R.F. SOCIETA CONSORTILE PER AZIONI) [X] 1,9,11 * paragraphs [0017] - [0031]; figures 1,2; claims 27,28 *;
 [DY]FR2828743  (ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL - COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE) [DY] 2,6,7,10 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 19; figures 1-10 * * page 5, line 9 - page 9, line 29 *;
 [A]US2001033401  (KASAI ICHIRO ET AL) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0099] , [0107] - [0114]; figures 16,19-23 *;
 [A]WO0079327  (THE MICROOPTICAL CORPORATION) [A] 2-7 * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 7; figure 7 *;
 [A]US6384982  (SPITZER MARK B) [A] 1-11 * column 10, lines 11-51; figure 9 * * column 12, lines 36-49; figure 14 * * column 13, lines 10-20; figure 16 * * column 15, lines 12-40; figure 28 *