Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1719070

EP1719070 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MARKING, TRACKING AND AUTHENTICATION OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/45]METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MAKING, TRACKING AND AUTHENTICATION OF PRODUCTS
[2009/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Change - applicantpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INEXTO SA
Avenue Edouard-Dapples 7
1006 Lausanne / CH
[2016/44]
Former [2013/26]For all designated states
Digital Coding and Tracking Association
c/o Transcontag AG
Dufourstrasse 55
8008 Zürich / CH
Former [2013/22]For all designated states
Digital Coding and Tracking Association
Seefeldstrasse 108
8008 Zürich / CH
Former [2006/45]For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SAGER, Alain
Route de Reynet 4
1615 Bossonnens / CH
02 / CHATELAIN, Philippe
Chemin de Chaudremont 12a
1373 Chavornay / CH
03 / FRADET, Erwan
Rue de la Jalousie 3
1135 Denens / CH
 [2007/33]
Former [2006/45]01 / SAGER, Alain
Route de Reynet 4
1615 Bossonnens / CH
02 / CHATELAIN, Philippe
Chemin de Chaudremont 12a
1373 Chavornay / CH
03 / FRADET, Erwan
Rue de Maupas 19c
1004 Lausanne / CH
Representative(s)Putet, Gilles , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
51 avenue Jean-Jaurès
B.P. 7073
69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]Münch, Martin Walter , et al
E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
Former [2006/45]Bradford, Victoria Sophie
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date05792643.829.09.2005
[2006/45]
WO2005IB03103
Priority number, dateEP2004010495408.10.2004         Original published format: EP 04104954
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006038114
Date:13.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1719070
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006
[2006/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1719070
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06K17/00
[2006/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/45]
Extension statesAL18.09.2006
BA18.09.2006
HR18.09.2006
MK18.09.2006
YU18.09.2006
TitleGerman:METHODEN UND SYSTEME ZUM HERSTELLEN, NACHVERFOLGEN UND AUTHENTIFIZIEREN VON PRODUKTEN[2006/45]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MARKING, TRACKING AND AUTHENTICATION OF PRODUCTS[2009/17]
French:MÉTHODES ET SYSTÈMES DE MARQUAGE,SUIVI ET AUTHENTIFICATION DE PRODUITS[2006/45]
Former [2006/45]METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MAKING, TRACKING AND AUTHENTICATION OF PRODUCTS
Entry into regional phase18.09.2006National basic fee paid 
18.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/45]
16.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2009Fee for grant paid
16.03.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.07.2009  29.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
KEIT LTD
j.k. Mladost 3, bl.380 Sofia 1712
Bulgaria / BG
Opponent's representative
Varbanov, Julian Ivanov
3, Pozitano street, fl. 2
BG-1000 Sofia / BG
 02  29.01.2010  16.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/10]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2009  29.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
KEIT LTD
j.k. Mladost 3, bl.380 Sofia 1712
Bulgaria / BG
Opponent's representative
Varbanov, Julian Ivanov
3, Pozitano street, fl. 2
BG-1000 Sofia / BG
 02  29.01.2010  16.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/11]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2009  29.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
KEIT LTD
j.k. Mladost 3, bl.380 Sofia 1712
Bulgaria / BG
Opponent's representative
Varbanov, Julian Ivanov
3, Pozitano street, fl. 2
BG-1000 Sofia / BG
 02  29.01.2010   
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Opponent's representative
Bublak, Wolfgang
Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2010/10]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2009  29.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
KEIT LTD
j.k. Mladost 3, bl.380 Sofia 1712
Bulgaria / BG
Opponent's representative
Varbanov, Julian Ivanov
3, Pozitano street, fl. 2
BG-1000 Sofia / BG
 02  29.01.2010   
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Former [2009/45]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2009  29.09.2009  ADMISSIBLE
KEIT LTD
j.k. Mladost 3, bl.380 Sofia 1712
Bulgaria / BG
Opponent's representative
Varbanov, Julian Ivanov
3, Pozitano street, fl. 2
BG-1000 Sofia / BG
Former [2009/36]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2009   
KEIT LTD
j.k. Mladost 3, bl.380 Sofia 1712
Bulgaria / BG
23.02.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.09.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2013Date of oral proceedings
24.07.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.07.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.09.2013Appeal received No.  T1921/13
20.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200703   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIS29.08.2009
[2010/01]
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10100248  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [X] 1,15,16,21,28,34,35 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6442276  (DOLJACK FRANK A [US]) [A] 1-40 * column W *