Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1793735

EP1793735 - PATIENT SEDATION MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.02.2010
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.03.2010  [2010/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hospira Sedation, Inc.
Five Billerica Park, 101 Billerica Avenue
North Billerica, MA 01862 / US
[2007/24]
Inventor(s)01 / MARRO, Dominic, P.
57 Colonial Avenue
North Andover, MA 01845 / US
02 / ORTEGA, Henry, R.
22 Lancaster Road
Hampstead, NH 03841 / US
 [2007/24]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/24]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05793954.826.08.2005
[2007/24]
WO2005US30596
Priority number, dateUS20040604799P26.08.2004         Original published format: US 604799 P
US2005021134925.08.2005         Original published format: US 211349
[2007/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006026528
Date:09.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1793735
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006
[2007/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05
[2007/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PATIENTEN-SEDATIONSMONITOR[2007/24]
English:PATIENT SEDATION MONITOR[2007/24]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE SEDATION DE PATIENT[2007/24]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2007National basic fee paid 
22.03.2007Search fee paid 
22.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/24]
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/10]
14.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004022131  (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 12 * * page 2, lines 17-28 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 8 * * page 9, lines 12-20 * * figure 1 *;
 [XY]US2001031916  (BENNETT HENRY L [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] , [0087] - [0089] * * figures 12,15 * [Y] 2-5;
 [XY]US2002095098  (MARINELLO STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029] * * claims 1,14-16 * [Y] 2-5;
 [XY]US4570640  (BARSA JOHN E [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10 * column 4, lines 35-43 * * column 11, lines 42-65 * * column 13, lines 20-29 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-5;
 [X]CN1148952  (XIN KAI [CN]) [X] 1,7,10 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4510936  (FOURCIN ADRIAN J [GB], et al) [Y] 2 * column 1, lines 38-51 *;
 [Y]US6238423  (BARDY GUST H [US]) [Y] 3-5 * column 11, lines 56-58 * * column 12, lines 35-62 * * figures 6,7 *
International search[X]US2001031916  (BENNETT HENRY L [US], et al);
 [Y]US4510936  (FOURCIN ADRIAN J [GB], et al);
 [Y]US6238423  (BARDY GUST H [US]);
 [Y]US5314448  (KROLL MARK W [US], et al)