Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1790184

EP1790184 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROUTING DATA BETWEEN DIFFERENT TYPES OF NODES IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meshnetworks, Inc.
485 North Keller Road, Suite 250
Maitland, FL 32751-7535 / US
[2007/22]
Inventor(s)01 / JOSHI, Avinash
2223 Falling Acorn Circle
Lake Mary, FL 32746 / US
02 / BARKER, Charles R. Jr.
7543 St. Stephens Ct.
Orlando, FL 32835 / US
03 / GOLDBERG, Keith J.
2854 Willow Bay Terr.
Casselberry, FL 32707 / US
04 / HASTY, William Vann Jr.
1713 Cedar Stone Court
Lake Mary, FL 32746 / US
05 / ROBERTS, Robin U.
1117 Campbell Street
Orlando, FL 32806 / US
06 / ZENG, Surong
594 Coral Glen Loop, Apt. 201
Altamonte Springs, FL 32714 / US
 [2007/39]
Former [2007/22]01 / JOSHI, Avinash
8738 Pisa Dr. 633
Orlando, FL 32810 / US
02 / BARKER, Charles R. Jr.
7543 St. Stephens Ct.
Orlando, FL 32835 / US
03 / GOLDBERG, Keith J.
2854 Willow Bay Terr.
Casselberry, FL 32707 / US
04 / HASTY, William Vann Jr.
1713 Cedar Stone Court
Lake Mary, FL 32746 / US
05 / ROBERTS, Robin U.
1117 Campbell Street
Orlando, FL 32806 / US
06 / ZENG, Surong
594 Coral Glen Loop, Apt. 201
Altamonte Springs, FL 32714 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2007/22]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date05794035.507.09.2005
[2007/22]
WO2005US31651
Priority number, dateUS20040607729P07.09.2004         Original published format: US 607729 P
US20040611845P22.09.2004         Original published format: US 611845 P
[2007/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006029131
Date:16.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1790184
Date:30.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006
[2007/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1790184
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.02.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04W40/24, H04W84/18, H04W84/22, H04W88/08
[2014/23]
Former International [2012/01]H04L12/56
Former International [2007/22]H04Q7/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/09]
Former [2007/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ROUTEN VON DATEN ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN ARTEN VON KNOTEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK[2007/22]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ROUTING DATA BETWEEN DIFFERENT TYPES OF NODES IN A WIRELESS NETWORK[2007/22]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR L'ACHEMINEMENT DE DONNEES ENTRE DIFFERENTS TYPES DE NOEUDS DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL[2007/22]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2007National basic fee paid 
20.03.2007Search fee paid 
20.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/22]
02.10.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.12.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2014Fee for grant paid
13.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2012
Opposition(s)20.08.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
09.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO03105502  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,9,12-14,20 * abstract * * page 33, line 10 - page 44, line 20 * * page 46, line 22 - page 49, line 11 * [A] 5-7,16-18 [I] 4,8,10,11,15,19,21,22;
 [XA]US2004103275  (JI LUSHENG [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,9-13,20-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0147] * [A] 3-8,14-19;
 [A]WO2004064303  (MESHNETWORKS INC [US]; AVINASH JOSHI [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - L. Ji, J. Agre, T. Iwao, N. Fujino, "On providing secure and portable wireless data Network services: architecture and data forwarding mechanisms", (20040108), Fujitsu Labs of America, URL: http://www.flacp.fujitsulabs.com/snownet-icmu-2004.pdf, (20111125), XP002664541 [X] 1,2,9-13,20-22 * abstract * * 1 BACKGROUND; column 1 - column 3 * * 3 SNOWNET ARCHITECTURE 4 SNOWNET DATA FORWARDING; column 4 - column 9 * [A] 3-8,14-19
International search[XP]US2005074019  (HANDFORTH MARTIN RIDGWAY [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2004090943  (DA COSTA FRANCIS [US], et al);
 [A]US5790546  (DOBBINS KURT [US], et al)
by applicantUS6807165
 US6873839
 WO03105502
 US2004103275
 US20010897790
 US20040863710