Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1786876

EP1786876 - SOLUBILIZED DYES FOR INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POTENZA, Joan Christine
119 Rush-West Rush Road
Rush, New York 14543 / US
02 / MADARAS, Marcel Bradut
587 Morning Glory Drive
Webster, New York 14580 / US
03 / SCHMITTHENNER, Hans Frederick
119 Rush-West Rush Road
Rush, New York 14543 / US
04 / SOUTHBY, David Thomas
115 Huntington Meadows
Rochester, New York 14625 / US
 [2007/21]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/13]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2008/30]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2007/21]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited, Patent Department, Headstone Drive Harrow
Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date05794080.101.09.2005
[2007/21]
WO2005US31227
Priority number, dateUS2004093559907.09.2004         Original published format: US 935599
[2007/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006028937
Date:16.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1786876
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006
[2007/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1786876
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00, C09B29/36
[2007/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/50]
Former [2007/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFGELÖSTE FARBSTOFFE FÜR TINTEN[2007/21]
English:SOLUBILIZED DYES FOR INKS[2007/21]
French:COLORANTS SOLUBILISES POUR ENCRES[2007/21]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2007National basic fee paid 
05.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/21]
16.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2001029869  (FUJIWARA TOSHIKI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * claim 12 *;
 [A]EP0566415  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * claim - *;
 [A]US4382801  (LOEW PETER [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1050563  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * claim 2 *;
 [A]EP1197535  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * claim 2 *