Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1793769

EP1793769 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISTRACTION OF THE SPINAL DISC SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2011
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.01.2012  [2012/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crosstrees Medical Inc.
7960 Niwot Rd. Unit B-8
Niwot, CO 80503 / US
[2007/24]
Inventor(s)01 / YUAN, Philip, S.
338 Whites Landing
Long Beach, CA 90803 / US
02 / LIN, Kwan, Ku
1235 Shenandoah Rd.
San Marino, CA 91108 / US
03 / SCRIBNER, Robert, M.
7042 Quiet Retreat Court
Niwot, CO 80503 / US
 [2007/24]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/24]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date05794205.402.09.2005
[2007/24]
WO2005US31356
Priority number, dateUS20040606611P02.09.2004         Original published format: US 606611 P
[2007/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006028986
Date:16.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1793769
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006
[2007/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.06.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44
[2007/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DISTRAKTION DES BANDSCHEIBENRAUMS[2007/24]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISTRACTION OF THE SPINAL DISC SPACE[2007/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DISTRACTION DE L'ESPACE INTERVERTEBRAL[2007/24]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2007National basic fee paid 
22.03.2007Search fee paid 
22.03.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/24]
02.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/04]
06.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PX]US2005143688  (LIN KWAN K [US] ET AL LIN KWAN KU [US] ET AL) [PX] 1-8 * figures 1-4b,5c-7a * * claims 1-3,5-8 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0021] *;
 [PA]US2004236272  (LIN KWAN KU [US] ET AL) [PA] 1-8 * figures 1-5c,8a,8b * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] *;
 [A]US2004059417  (SMITH STEPHEN A [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * figures 3-7,9-13 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0038] - [0041] *;
 [A]WO2004052248  (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US]; TRIEU HAI H [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6,11,12 * * page 4, lines 3-14 *
International search[A]US6402784  ;
 [A]US6245107  ;
 [A]US6508839  ;
 [A]WO0226170  ;
 [A]WO03057088  ;
 [A]US6146422  ;
 [A]US6488710  ;
 [A]US6533817  ;
 [A]US6712819  ;
 [A]US2004106999
by applicantUS5976186
 US6508839
 US6602291
 US2005043688