blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1802752

EP1802752 - PARALLEL PATCH CLAMP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.05.2021
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2021Revocation of patentpublished on 23.06.2021  [2021/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Molecular Devices, LLC
3860 N. First Street
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[2018/33]
Former [2012/18]For all designated states
Molecular Devices, LLC
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
MDS Analytical Technologies (US) Inc.
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Former [2007/27]For all designated states
MOLECULAR DEVICES CORPORATION
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089-1136 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FINKEL, Alan S., @Molecular Devices Corporation
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, California 94089-1136 / US
 [2012/24]
Former [2007/27]01 / FINKEL, Alan S., Molecular Devices Corporation
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, California 94089-1136 / US
Representative(s)Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/01]Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg a. Lech / DE
Former [2007/27]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date05795434.909.09.2005
[2007/27]
WO2005US32044
Priority number, dateUS20040608699P10.09.2004         Original published format: US 608699 P
US20040614361P28.09.2004         Original published format: US 614361 P
US20050700464P18.07.2005         Original published format: US 700464 P
[2007/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2006031612
Date:23.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1802752
Date:04.07.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1802752
Date:13.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.02.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2008
ClassificationIPC:C12N13/00, C12M1/34
[2007/27]
CPC:
G01N33/48728 (EP,US); G01N33/6872 (EP,US); G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/27]
TitleGerman:PARALLELES PATCH-CLAMP-SYSTEM[2007/27]
English:PARALLEL PATCH CLAMP SYSTEM[2007/27]
French:SYSTEME DE PATCH CLAMP PARALLELE[2007/27]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2007National basic fee paid 
05.04.2007Search fee paid 
05.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/27]
26.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.01.2012
19.01.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2012Fee for grant paid
23.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013    ADMISSIBLE
Nanion Technologies GmbH
Gabrielenstrasse 9
80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kirchner, Christian
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5 - 7
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/20]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2013    ADMISSIBLE
Nanion Technologies GmbH
Gabrielenstrasse 9
80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kirchner, Christian
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwalt
Zweibrückenstrasse 5 - 7
80331 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.10.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.03.2021Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/25]
10.05.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2728/16
22.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2021Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
10.05.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
26.03.2021Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.12.2009Request for further processing filed
23.12.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.01.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200703   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2007
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.09.2005
AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
IE09.09.2012
LU09.09.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
IE09.09.2012
LU09.09.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2014/21]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
IE09.09.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/34]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
IE09.09.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/33]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
IE09.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
ES24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/20]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/15]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
NL13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
IT13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
CZ13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
RO13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
Former [2013/09]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT13.06.2012
BE13.06.2012
CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
Former [2012/48]FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
Former [2012/47]LT13.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9966329  (CENES LTD [GB], et al) [DA] * the whole document *;
 [DXY]US2002053915  (WEAVER CHARLES DAVID [US], et al) [DX] 1-30 * paragraphs [0016] , [0025] , [0030] , [0031] , [0034] , [0040] , [0050] , [0065] * * examples 1,2,5 * * figure 1 * * claims 32,41,43,49-52 * * idem * [Y] 31-48;
 [A]US2002104757  (SCHMIDT CHRISTIAN [DE]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [DY]US2003070923  (SCHROEDER KIRK S [US], et al) [DY] 31-48 * paragraphs [0163] - [0165] *;
 [Y]US2004146849  (HUANG MINGXIAN [US], et al) [Y] 31-48 * paragraphs [0340] , [0341] *;
 [Y]  - MEYER B. JACKSON, Current Protocols in Neuroscience - Whole-cell Voltage clamp recording, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, (1997), XP002500967 [Y] 31-48 * page 6.6.13 - page 6.6.14 *
 [T]  - FINKEL ALAN ET AL, "Population patch clamp improves data consistency and success rates in the measurement of ionic currents.", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING AUG 2006, (200608), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1087-0571, pages 488 - 496, XP008097818 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1087057106288050
International search[A]US6699697  (KLEMIC KATHRYN G [US], et al);
 [A]US2004251145  (ROBERTSON JANET KAY [US]);
 [A]US2004055901  (PETERSEN JON WULFF [DK], et al);
 [A]US2003129581  (OWEN DAVID GERAINT [GB], et al)
by applicantUS2002053915
 WO9966329
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.