Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1809237 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1809237



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 442
21.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
11.11.2009 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
04.11.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.12.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.11.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
29.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
29.09.2008 Description Search / examination 12
29.09.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.09.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
29.09.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
26.09.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 29
26.09.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
09.09.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.06.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.06.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.06.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.06.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
10.06.2008 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 7
02.06.2008 Description Search / examination 14
02.06.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
29.05.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 24
16.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 7
16.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 7
16.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
15.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 7
15.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 7
15.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
25.01.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.08.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
06.08.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.07.2007 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
27.06.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.06.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
13.06.2007 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
04.06.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 13
30.05.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
23.04.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
23.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 5
23.04.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.03.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.12.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
13.12.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
16.11.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
16.11.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
06.07.2006 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
06.07.2006 Request for correction of obvious error International Searching Authority 3
06.07.2006 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
05.07.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.07.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
07.06.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
18.05.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 42
23.12.2005 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 4
04.11.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.11.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 6
04.11.2005 Description International Searching Authority 35