Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1809237


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
23.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.10.2011  [2011/43]
08.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2011  [2011/32]
19.02.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.03.2010  [2010/12]
27.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.12.2009  [2009/53]
06.11.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.12.2009  [2009/50]
18.09.2009 Change - representative published on  21.10.2009  [2009/43]
05.06.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.07.2009  [2009/28]
28.11.2008 (Expected) grant published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
03.10.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.10.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.09.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
19.06.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.04.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.01.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.10.2007 First examination report
29.09.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.09.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2007 Change - extension states published on  05.09.2007  [2007/36]
03.07.2007 Request for preliminary examination
22.06.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.07.2007  [2007/30]
22.06.2007 Request for examination filed published on  25.07.2007  [2007/30]
07.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2007 Amendment by applicant
21.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
02.02.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
17.11.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
20.12.2005 PCT data prior to European publication