Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1809237

EP1809237 - OPHTHALMIC OIL-IN-WATER TYPE EMULSION WITH STABLE POSITIVE ZETA POTENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novagali Pharma S.A.
1 rue Pierre Fontaine
91000 Evry / FR
[2009/01]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
Novagali Pharma SA
1 rue Pierre Fontaine
91000 Evry / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BAGUE, Séverine
17 rue Fromagère
F-91310 Linas / FR
02 / PHILIPS, Betty
193 rue Adolphe Pajeaud
F-92160 Antony / FR
03 / RABINOVICH-GUILATT, Laura
25 rue Paul Barruel
F-75015 Paris / FR
04 / LAMBERT, Gregory, Les Murs Blancs
19 rue Henri Marrou
F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR
05 / GARRIGUE, Jean-Sébastien
15 rue d'Estienne d'Orves, Résidence de la Poste
Bâtiment 4, F-91370 Verrières Le Buisson / FR
 [2007/30]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2008/35]de Mareüil-Villette, Caroline
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2007/30]de Mareüil-Villette, Caroline
Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire
F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date05795930.610.10.2005
[2007/30]
WO2005EP11650
Priority number, dateEP2004029264509.11.2004         Original published format: EP 04292645
US2004099134618.11.2004         Original published format: US 991346
[2007/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006050838
Date:18.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1809237
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006
[2007/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1809237
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K9/107
[2007/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPHTHALMISCHE ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSION MIT STABILEM POSITIVEM ZETA-POTENTIAL[2007/30]
English:OPHTHALMIC OIL-IN-WATER TYPE EMULSION WITH STABLE POSITIVE ZETA POTENTIAL[2007/30]
French:ÉMULSION HUILE-DANS-EAU À BASSE CONCENTRATION DE L'AGENT CATIONIQUE ET AU POTENTIEL DE ZÉTA POSITIF[2007/30]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2007National basic fee paid 
23.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/30]
05.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2008Fee for grant paid
26.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.12.2008
CY31.12.2008
CZ31.12.2008
EE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
LT31.12.2008
LV31.12.2008
PL31.12.2008
RO31.12.2008
SI31.12.2008
SK31.12.2008
TR31.12.2008
BG31.03.2009
IS30.04.2009
HU01.07.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT31.12.2008
CZ31.12.2008
EE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
LT31.12.2008
LV31.12.2008
PL31.12.2008
RO31.12.2008
SI31.12.2008
SK31.12.2008
BG31.03.2009
IS30.04.2009
HU01.07.2009
Former [2010/12]AT31.12.2008
CZ31.12.2008
EE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
LT31.12.2008
LV31.12.2008
PL31.12.2008
RO31.12.2008
SI31.12.2008
SK31.12.2008
BG31.03.2009
IS30.04.2009
Former [2010/01]AT31.12.2008
CZ31.12.2008
EE31.12.2008
FI31.12.2008
LT31.12.2008
LV31.12.2008
PL31.12.2008
RO31.12.2008
SI31.12.2008
SK31.12.2008
IS30.04.2009
Former [2009/28]FI31.12.2008
LV31.12.2008
PL31.12.2008
SI31.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[DXI]US2003108626  (BENITA SIMON [IL], et al) [DX] 1-9,11,12,14,17-26 * paragraphs [0047] - [0052] * [I] 10,13,15,16,27;
 [XI]WO03053405  (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,17-26 * page 8, line 19 - line 29; claims 1,4-7,11 * [I] 10,13,15,16,27;
 [DXAI]US6007826  (BENITA SIMON [IL], et al) [DX] 1-9,14,17-19,22,24-26 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 10 - line 15 * * column 5, line 16 - line 41; claims 1-3,5,10,17 * [A] 15,16,20,21 [I] 10-13,23,27;
 [DXAI]EP0696452  (CUSI LAB [ES]) [DX] 1-6,8,9,11,14,17-19,24-26 * page 3, lines 41-45; examples 5,7 * [A] 20,21 [I] 7,10,12,15,16,22,23,27;
 [XI]EP0878197  (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,14,17-19,22-26 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 11; examples 3,5 * [I] 6-8,13,15,16,27;
 [E]EP1611879  (NOVAGALI PHARMA SA [FR], et al) [E] 1-9,14,17-26 * the whole document *;
 [DA]  - CHOI W-J ET AL, "Low toxicity of cationic lipid-based emulsion for gene transfer", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20040225), vol. 25, no. 27, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 5893 - 5903, XP004511128 [DA] 1-26 * abstract * * page 5893, column L, paragraph 1 * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2004.01.031
    [ ] - ANONYMUS, INTERNET ARTICLE, (20040225), page 1, URL: doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2004.01.031, (20050405), XP002323251
 [DA]  - OTT G ET AL, "A cationic sub-micron emulsion (MF59/DOTAP) is an effective delivery system for DNA vaccines", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020219), vol. 79, no. 1-3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 1 - 5, XP004340908 [DA] 1-26 * abstract * * page 2, column L, paragraph L * * column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00545-4
 [DA]  - OGAWA SATOSHI ET AL, "Production and characterization of O/W emulsions containing cationic droplets stabilized by lecithin-chitosan membranes.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY. 23 APR 2003, (20030423), vol. 51, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 2806 - 2812, XP002323017 [DA] 1-26 * page 2807, column R, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 2808, column R, paragraph L; figures 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf020590f
 [A]  - TAMILVANAN S ET AL, "The potential of lipid emulsion for ocular delivery of lipophilic drugs", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040601), vol. 58, no. 2, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 357 - 368, XP004526318 [A] 1-26 * page 360, column R, line 13 - line 23 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2004.03.033
by applicantUS6007826
 US6656460
 WO03053405
 EP0696452
 EP0878197
 EP1611879
    - TAMILVANAN ET AL., STP PHARMA SCIENCES, (2001), vol. 11, pages 421 - 426