Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1751187 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1751187



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 801
01.08.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 26
27.07.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
23.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
23.09.2015 Claims Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Claims Appeal 2
23.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
23.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
23.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 202
08.09.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 27
07.09.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.02.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.02.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.09.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.09.2014 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
04.07.2014 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
26.06.2014 General enquiry Appeal 1
16.06.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.02.2014 Submission concerning representation Appeal 2
13.12.2013 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
14.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
04.10.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
04.10.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
28.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
03.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.01.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
24.10.2012 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
16.12.2011 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
08.11.2011 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
04.11.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
02.11.2011 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
25.10.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.09.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
08.08.2011 Claims Appeal 2
08.08.2011 Claims Appeal 2
08.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.08.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.08.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
31.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.05.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.05.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.03.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
28.03.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
28.03.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
25.03.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
25.03.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
25.03.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
25.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.03.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
14.02.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.02.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
17.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
17.01.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
17.01.2011 Annex Search / examination 2
17.01.2011 Annex Search / examination 3
17.01.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
17.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 6
17.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
17.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 10
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
17.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
04.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
04.08.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
02.08.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2010 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 1
02.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
02.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 21
02.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.07.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.06.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.06.2009 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
03.06.2009 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
20.05.2009 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
08.05.2009 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
17.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
17.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
17.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
17.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
17.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.02.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.10.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.01.2008 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.11.2007 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
13.11.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
04.04.2007 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.02.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.01.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.11.2006 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
28.11.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
28.11.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
24.11.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.07.2006 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
06.07.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2006 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.03.2006 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.02.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
19.01.2006 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 50
11.11.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.11.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 5
11.11.2005 Description International Searching Authority 32
11.11.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 12