Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1809486

EP1809486 - SECURITY DEVICE AND SECURITY SUPPORT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oberthur Fiduciaire SAS
7 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Gewerbepark 30
4342 Baumgartenberg / AT
[2018/36]
Former [2018/09]For all designated states
Oberthur Fiduciaire SAS
7 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Gewerbepark 30
4342 Baumgartenberg / AT
Former [2015/21]For all designated states
Arjowiggins Security
32 avenue Pierre Grenier
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
For all designated states
Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Gewerbepark 30
4342 Baumgartenberg / AT
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
Arjowiggins Security
117 Quai du Président Roosevelt
92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR
For all designated states
Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Gewerbepark 30
4342 Baumgartenberg / AT
Inventor(s)01 / VAST, Nathalie
24 rue de la Gare
62144 Mont Saint Eloi / FR
02 / MULLER, Matthias
Fichtenweg 4
D-92699 Bechtsrieth / DE
03 / KASTNER, Friedrich
Untersteinbach 17
A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT
 [2008/40]
Former [2007/41]01 / VAST, Nathalie
24 rue de la Gare
62144 Mont Saint Eloi / FR
02 / MULLER, Matthias
Fichtenweg 4
D-92699 BECHTSRIETH / DE
03 / KASTNER, Friedrich
Untersteinbach 17
A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT
Former [2007/30]01 / VAST, Nathalie
19, chemin de la Marinière
F-91370 Verrieres Le Buisson / FR
02 / MULLER, Matthias
Fichtenweg 4
D-92699 BECHTSRIETH / DE
03 / KASTNER, Friedrich
Untersteinbach 17
A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]Tanty, François
Nony & Partners, 3, Rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date05798539.228.10.2005
[2007/30]
WO2005IB53536
Priority number, dateEP2004029258029.10.2004         Original published format: EP 04292580
[2007/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006046216
Date:04.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1809486
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006
[2007/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1809486
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/00, B42D15/10
[2007/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG UND DIESE UMFASSENDER SICHERHEITSTRÄGER[2007/30]
English:SECURITY DEVICE AND SECURITY SUPPORT COMPRISING SAME[2007/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE ET SUPPORT DE SECURITE L'INTEGRANT[2007/30]
Entry into regional phase16.04.2007National basic fee paid 
16.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/30]
16.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.12.2008Fee for grant paid
31.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.2009  04.11.2009  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  23.11.2009  27.11.2009  ADMISSIBLE
DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP, et al
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 03  24.11.2009  02.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert, et al
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Merianstrasse 26
90409 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.2009  04.11.2009  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  23.11.2009  27.11.2009  ADMISSIBLE
DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP, et al
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 03  24.11.2009  02.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert, et al
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Merianstrasse 26
90409 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2010/01]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.2009  04.11.2009  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  23.11.2009   
DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB
Opponent's representative
Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
 03  24.11.2009   
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert, et al
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26
90409 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2009/50]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.2009  04.11.2009  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
13.01.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.07.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.03.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0811/15
10.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
21.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT25.07.2009
LU28.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/22]BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
LU28.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/25]BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/13]BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2010/01]BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004100707  (KAY RALPH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-27 * page 2, paragraph 34 - page 3, paragraph 46; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US6082778  (SOLMSDORF BERNHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-14,17-27 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 51; figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP0496180  (ARYSEARCH ARYLAN AG [LI]) [Y] 15,16 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 3 *;
 [Y]WO03095225  (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * page 7, paragraph 1; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]WO0157832  (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 5, line 9 - page 7, line 16; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5310222  (CHATWIN CHARLES E [GB], et al) [A] 27 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2004100707
 US6082778