blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1792288 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1792288



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 866
06.10.2017 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
02.10.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
29.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
20.06.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
20.06.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 23
20.06.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Minutes of the taking of evidence Opposition 10
20.06.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.06.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.04.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
03.02.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
03.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.02.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.02.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.10.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.09.2016 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
26.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.09.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 15
25.07.2016 Decision on the taking of evidence Opposition 4
25.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
25.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.07.2016 Settlement of expenses for witnesses and experts Opposition 2
25.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2016 Summons to give evidence Opposition 2
02.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.03.2016 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
08.03.2016 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
03.12.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
13.11.2015 Claims Opposition 3
13.11.2015 Claims Opposition 3
13.11.2015 Claims Opposition 3
13.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
11.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
19.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
22.06.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.06.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.06.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.03.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
18.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
04.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
24.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
17.04.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
12.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.02.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.02.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.10.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.10.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.09.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.08.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
28.08.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
28.08.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
28.11.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.11.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
19.10.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.10.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
17.10.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.10.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.06.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.06.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.06.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.06.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
15.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
06.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
06.08.2009 Description Search / examination 7
06.08.2009 Description Search / examination 7
06.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
05.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
05.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
05.08.2009 Description Search / examination 7
05.08.2009 Description Search / examination 7
05.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
19.06.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.02.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
02.12.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
01.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
01.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
01.12.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
23.09.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 5
04.09.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
06.05.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.05.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.05.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
09.05.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.05.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
20.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
11.04.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
11.04.2007 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.03.2007 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 5
22.03.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
22.03.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
09.02.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.04.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
06.04.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
06.04.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32