Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1828439

EP1828439 - PROTECTIVE ANODE COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2011  [2011/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organization
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU
[2007/36]
Inventor(s)01 / JAHEDI, Mahnaz
1/ 2 Theodore Court
Toorak, Victoria 3142 / AU
02 / GULIZIA, Enzo
1/7 Marama Street
Coburg North, Victoria 3058 / AU
03 / OH, Chull Hee
17 Bowman Street
Mt. Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU
04 / GULIZIA, Stefan
6 Willowtree Drive
Werribee, Victoria 3030 / AU
 [2007/36]
Representative(s)Benson, John Everett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/36]Benson, John Everett
J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date05799180.427.10.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005AU01665
Priority number, dateAU2004090623628.10.2004         Original published format: AU 2004906236
[2007/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006045154
Date:04.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1828439
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006
[2007/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU04.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C25C3/12, C25C7/02
[2007/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2008/21]
Former [2007/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YU29.05.2007
TitleGerman:ANODENSCHUTZBESCHICHTUNG[2007/36]
English:PROTECTIVE ANODE COATINGS[2007/36]
French:REVETEMENTS PROTECTEURS POUR ANODES[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2007National basic fee paid 
29.05.2007Search fee paid 
29.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
10.09.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.11.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/20]
30.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2011/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]SU487160  ;
 [A]WO9623745  (PECHINEY RECHERCHE [FR], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 10 - page 12; claims 1-17 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 29, Database accession no. 1976-55615X, XP002505463 & SU487160 A 19760109 (YAKUNIN N P) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-20 * abstract *
International search[A]WO8402724  (ELTECH SYSTEMS CORP [US]);
 [A]WO0161076  (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al);
 [A]US4477579  (REVEN FREDERICK V [US]);
 [A]CN1584125
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 39, Database accession no. 2005-373152, XP008113527 & CN1584125 A 20050223 (UNIV GUANGXI NORMAL)