Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1815370

EP1815370 - MESSAGE INTEGRITY FOR SECURE COMMUNICATION OF WIRELESS MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.04.2009
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BALDUS, Heribert
Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / SANCHEZ, David, Sanchez c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2007/38]
Former [2007/32]01 / BALDUS, Heribert
Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / SANCHEZ, David, Sanchez
Aretzstrasse 53
52070 Aachen / DE
Representative(s)de Haan, Poul Erik , et al
Philips International B.V.
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Verweij, Petronella Danielle , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/32]Golla, Anke Lucia
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date05799470.904.11.2005
[2007/32]
WO2005IB53614
Priority number, dateUS20040627411P12.11.2004         Original published format: US 627411 P
[2007/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006051461
Date:18.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1815370
Date:08.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006
[2007/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2007/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NACHRICHTENINTEGRITÄT ZUR SICHEREN KOMMUNIKATION VON DRAHTLOSEN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN[2007/32]
English:MESSAGE INTEGRITY FOR SECURE COMMUNICATION OF WIRELESS MEDICAL DEVICES[2007/32]
French:INTEGRITE DE MESSAGE POUR COMMUNICATION SECURISEE DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX SANS FIL[2007/32]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2007National basic fee paid 
12.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/32]
06.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
12.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.12.2017Appeal received
27.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.04.2008Request for further processing filed
10.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2002013538  (TELLER DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0145]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO03043494  (MEDIT AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 2, line 1 - page 9, line 22 * * page 10, line 10 - page 61, line 27 * * claims 1,9 *;
 [A]US2004176694  (KIM JAEHO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0111] *;
 [A]WO03009208  (MEDICAL RES GROUP [US], et al) [A] 6,15 * page 9, line 10 - page 43, line 31 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US5769641  (LAMPOTANG SAMSUN [US], et al) [A] 4-7,14-18 * column 25, line 13 - line 62 *;
 [A]WO02087681  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 6, line 1 - page 43, line 9 *;
 [A]US2004076183  (KOBBE RICK ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0040] *
by applicantUS2002013538
 WO03043494