Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1812276

EP1812276 - STRUCTURAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2007/31]
Inventor(s)01 / HEDLUND, Anders
Fanjunkaregsatan 9A
S-415 04 Göteborg / SE
02 / FREDÖ, Claes
Von Holtens väg 4
S-443 32 Lerum / SE
 [2007/31]
Representative(s)Fröhling, Werner Otto
Volvo Technology Corporation
Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/31]Fröhling, Werner Otto
Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7
405 08 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date05802578.411.11.2005
[2007/31]
WO2005SE01712
Priority number, dateSE2004000278111.11.2004         Original published format: SE 0402781
[2007/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006052210
Date:18.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1812276
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006
[2007/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1812276
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/20
[2008/21]
Former International [2007/31]B62D25/20, B62D21/10, G05D19/00, F16F7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGELEMENT[2007/31]
English:STRUCTURAL ELEMENT[2007/31]
French:ELEMENT STRUCTUREL[2007/31]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2007National basic fee paid 
11.06.2007Search fee paid 
11.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/31]
24.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
16.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2011Fee for grant paid
16.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.09.2009
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HU20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IE11.11.2011
LU11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IE11.11.2011
LU11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/29]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IE11.11.2011
LU11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/25]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IE11.11.2011
LU11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/04]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IE11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/47]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IE11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/46]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
GB11.11.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/33]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/31]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/23]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/21]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/12]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/11]AT20.07.2011
BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/10]BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/09]BE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/08]LT20.07.2011
IS20.11.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH09202269  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [X]EP1281604  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]);
 [X]JPH05221342  (SUZUKI MOTOR CO)
by applicantJPH09202269
 DE10215911