Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1812276 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1812276



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 144
25.05.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.05.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.05.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
16.05.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
07.02.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.02.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.02.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.02.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
20.02.2010 Description Search / examination 2
20.02.2010 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.02.2010 Description Search / examination 2
16.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.02.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.01.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
24.09.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.05.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
06.05.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.04.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.04.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 1
17.04.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.06.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.05.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
21.04.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.04.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
18.04.2007 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 9
23.03.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.06.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
18.05.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.05.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21