Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1827500

EP1827500 - PEGYLATED LIPOSOMAL DOXORUBICIN IN COMBINATION WITH ECTEINESCIDIN 743 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.01.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pharma Mar S.A., Sociedad Unipersonal
Polígono Industrial La Mina Avenida de los Reyes, 1 Colmenar Viejo
28770 Madrid / ES
For all designated states
Ortho Biotech Products L.P.
700 Us Highway 202
Raritan NJ 08869 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/36]For all designated states
Pharma Mar S.A., Sociedad Unipersonal
Polígono Industrial La Mina Avda. de los Reyes, 1 Colmenar Viejo
28770 Madrid / ES
For all designated states
Ortho Biotech Products L.P.
700 Us Highway 202
Raritan NJ 08869 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GILLES, Erard
547 Meadow Road
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
02 / STERNAS, Lars-Axel
16 Montclair Avenue
Verona, New Jersey 07044 / US
03 / TRIFAN, Ovid
41 Penny Lane
Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US
04 / VAN DE VELDE, Helgi
Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
05 / TEITELBAUM, April
4255 Erica Drive
Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18901 / US
 [2009/19]
Former [2007/39]01 / GILLES, Erard
547 Meadow Road
Bridgewater, New Jersey 0887 / US
02 / STERNAS, Lars-Axel
16 Montclair Avenue
Verona, New Jersey 7044 / US
03 / TRIFAN, Ovid
41 Penny Lane
Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US
04 / VAN DE VELDE, Helgi
Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
05 / TEITELBAUM, April
4255 Erica Drive
Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18901 / US
Former [2007/36]01 / GILLES, Erard
547 Meadow Road
Bridgewater, New Jersey 0887 / US
02 / STERNAS, Lars-Axel
16 Montclair Avenue
Verona, New Jersey 7044 / US
03 / TRIFAN, Ovid
140 Salvatore Court
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
04 / VAN DE VELDE, Helgi
Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
05 / TEITELBAUM, April
4255 Erica Drive
Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18901 / US
Representative(s)Andrews, Timothy Stephen , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/14]Fleck, Barbara , et al
Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
Former [2007/36]Gurney, Steven , et al
Marks & Clerk 66-68 Hills Road
GB-Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date05803151.926.10.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005GB50189
Priority number, dateUS20040622163P26.10.2004         Original published format: US 622163 P
[2007/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006046080
Date:04.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1827500
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1827500
Date:06.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48, A61K31/704, A61K31/4995, A61K45/06, A61P35/00
[2008/34]
Former International [2007/36]A61K47/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
Extension statesAL26.04.2007
BA26.04.2007
HR26.04.2007
MK26.04.2007
YU26.04.2007
TitleGerman:PEGYLIERTES LIPOSOMALES DOXORUBICIN IN KOMBINATION MIT ECTEINESCIDIN 743[2007/36]
English:PEGYLATED LIPOSOMAL DOXORUBICIN IN COMBINATION WITH ECTEINESCIDIN 743[2007/36]
French:DOXORUBICINE LIPOSOMIALE PEGYLEE EN COMBINAISON AVEC L' ECTEINESCIDINE 743[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase26.04.2007National basic fee paid 
26.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
12.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2009Fee for grant paid
08.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2010  19.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/25]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2010  19.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2010/12]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2010   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Clarke, Lionel Paul
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
30.06.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.02.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2012Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.10.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.10.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/08]
13.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.01.2013Appeal received No.  T2506/12
01.03.2013Statement of grounds filed
04.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
06.12.2012Appeal received No.  T2506/12
01.03.2013Statement of grounds filed
04.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
04.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
08.01.2009Request for further processing filed
08.01.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH06.05.2009
LI06.05.2009
[2017/26]
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO0236135  (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [DX] 1-5,12,14-21,24,26-28,30 * page 5, line 4; examples 1,2; claim 6 *;
 [PX]WO2005049029  (PHARMA MAR SAU [ES], et al) [PX] 18,21,24 * abstract *;
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "Doxil (doxorubicin HCl liposome injection) product information", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20041010), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20041009180801/www.doxil.com/05_shared_pages/01_prescribing_info.html, (20060710), XP002389462 [X] 13,14,16,22,25 * page 12, column 1 * * page 14, column 1 *
 [Y]  - LAVERDIERE CAROLINE ET AL, "Phase II study of ecteinascidin 743 in heavily pretreated patients with recurrent osteosarcoma", CANCER, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20030815), vol. 98, no. 4, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 832 - 840, XP002314512 [Y] 1-30 * page 837, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 838, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.11563
 [Y]  - TAKAHASHI N ET AL, "Sequence-dependent enhancement of cytotoxicity produced by ecteinascidin 743 (ET-743) with doxorubicin or paclitaxel in soft tissue sarcoma cells", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (200110), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3251 - 3257, XP002314514 [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * see discussion *
 [PX]  - SESSA C. ET AL, "Trabectedin for women with ovarian carcinoma after treatment with platinum and taxane fails", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (20050320), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1867 - 1874, XP002389463 [PX] 1-30 * page 1873, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2005.09.032