Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1827500 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1827500



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2100
16.01.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.12.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 37
13.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.11.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 3
08.09.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.09.2016 Claims Appeal 1
01.09.2016 Claims Appeal 2
01.09.2016 Claims Appeal 2
01.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 42
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 49
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 43
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.09.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
10.08.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
10.08.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
14.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
07.07.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.07.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
06.07.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
22.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.09.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.07.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 28
07.07.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 28
07.07.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 64
24.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
13.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
23.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
17.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 19
06.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 20
12.07.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.07.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
08.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
07.03.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
01.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
01.03.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.03.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 23
01.03.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.03.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.03.2013 Claims Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Claims Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
01.03.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
01.03.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
23.01.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
23.01.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.01.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.01.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.01.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.01.2013 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 2
04.01.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.01.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.01.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.12.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.12.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.12.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.12.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
06.12.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
19.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
25.10.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.10.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
25.10.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.10.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.10.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Means of redress Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
25.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.09.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 7
25.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.09.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
24.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.09.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 20
24.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Claims Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
24.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
24.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
21.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.08.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
15.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
20.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
06.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
08.06.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.06.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.05.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.05.2011 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.05.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.04.2011 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2011 Request for documents Opposition 1
14.02.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
10.02.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 22
13.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.12.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
07.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.10.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
19.10.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.06.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 25
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 80
07.04.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.04.2010 Request for documents Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Request for documents Opposition 1
05.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.02.2010 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 17
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.02.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
05.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
05.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
09.04.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.04.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.03.2009 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
26.02.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
14.01.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
08.01.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 2
08.01.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.01.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
08.01.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.01.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.12.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.11.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
25.11.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
19.11.2008 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
24.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
24.10.2008 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
21.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
21.10.2008 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
28.07.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.07.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.07.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
22.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
15.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
15.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
28.02.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
18.12.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 17
18.12.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.12.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.08.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.08.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.07.2007 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
18.07.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.07.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.07.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.07.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.07.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
09.07.2007 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.06.2007 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
13.06.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.05.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
26.04.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
26.04.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.03.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.10.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.10.2006 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
19.10.2006 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.08.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
04.05.2006 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
17.11.2005 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
17.11.2005 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
17.11.2005 Description PCT receiving Office 18
17.11.2005 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1