Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1802273

EP1802273 - HYPOALLERGENIC FOOD COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Avenue
Topeka, KS 66603 / US
[2016/18]
Former [2007/27]For all designated states
Hill's Pet Nutrition Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Avenue
Topeka, KS 66603 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VANDE GIESSEN, Timothy Glen
7744 SW 27th Street
Topeka, KS 66614 / US
02 / SHAH, Naina, Kiran
1704 Troon Lane
Lawrence, KS 66047 / US
03 / MONTELONGO, Luis José
4305 Helianthus Drive
Lawrence, KS 66047 / US
04 / JEWELL, Dennis Edward
1752 East 980 Road
Lawrence, KS 66049 / US
05 / DIERKING, Mark Lee
4815 NW Felding Place 6
Topeka, KS 66618 / US
06 / QVYJT, Fernando
5630 SW Hawick Lane
Topeka, KS 66614 / US
 [2007/27]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2007/27]Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date05803644.323.09.2005
[2007/27]
WO2005US34079
Priority number, dateUS20040612661P24.09.2004         Original published format: US 612661 P
US2004099622323.11.2004         Original published format: US 996223
[2007/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006036766
Date:06.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1802273
Date:04.07.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006
[2007/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1802273
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.06.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/97, A23J3/30, A23K10/00, A23K20/00, A23K50/00, A23L33/17
[2016/17]
Former International [2012/03]A61K8/97, A23J3/30, A23K1/00, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A23L1/305
Former International [2007/27]A61K8/97
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/18]
Former [2007/27]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:HYPOALLERGENE LEBENSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2007/27]
English:HYPOALLERGENIC FOOD COMPOSITION[2007/27]
French:COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE HYPOALLERGENIQUE[2007/27]
Entry into regional phase06.04.2007National basic fee paid 
06.04.2007Search fee paid 
06.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/27]
27.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2016Fee for grant paid
09.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.02.2017   
Mars, Incorporated
6885 Elm Street
Mclean, Virginia 22101 / US
Opponent's representative
Cockerton, Bruce Roger
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2017/14]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.03.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.07.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
16.05.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.05.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.07.2018Appeal received No.  T1819/18
26.09.2018Statement of grounds filed
10.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
09.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200703   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2008
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.09.2005
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU23.09.2005
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2018/29]HU23.09.2005
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU23.09.2005
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/41]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
Former [2017/31]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
Former [2016/49]FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
Former [2016/46]LT04.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP1236405  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [XD] 1,18,25,26 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0037] *;
 [XD]US2003035882  (MCDANIEL LAWRENCE [US] ET AL MCDANIEL III LAWRENCE [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-32 * paragraph [0012] - paragraphs [0022] , [0045] , [0048] *;
 [X]US6403142  (MCDANIEL III LAWRENCE [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,25,26 * column 6 *;
 [X]WO2004060080  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1 * page 5 - page 6 *;
 [AD]US5039532  (JOST ROLF [CH] ET AL) [AD] 1,18,25,26 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5589357  (MARTINEZ SARAH B [US] ET AL) [AD] 1,18,25,26 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4879131  (DE RHAM OLIVIER [CH]) [AD] 1,18,25,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002132288  (SWAMYLINGAPPA BHAGYA [IN], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5837312  (CORDLE CHRISTOPHER T [US] ET AL) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4981704  (THIBAULT PHILIPPE A [FR]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5928686  ;
 [X]US2566549  ;
 [X]US5039532  ;
 [X]US4981704
OppositionWO2006036766
 WO0184950
 US6403142
 EP1236405
 US4781939
    - CAVE, N. J. et al., "A method for in vitro evaluation of protein hydrolysates for potential inclusion in veterinary diets", Research in Veterinary Science, (20040617), vol. 77, no. 3, pages 231 - 238, XP055351827

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rvsc.2004.04.011