Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1819500

EP1819500 - HOLDER AND METHOD FOR SHAPING A SOUND TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 28.02.2018  [2018/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GN ReSound A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2007/34]For all designated states
GN Resound A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7
2750 Ballerup / DK
Inventor(s)01 / IPSEN, Klaus, Sommer
Kilholmvej 3
DK-2720 Vanløse / DK
02 / ANDERSEN, Dennis, Normann
Gjelstensåsen 219
DK-3650 Ølstykke / DK
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2007/34]Jakobsen, Gert Hoey
Albihns A/S, H.C. Andersens Boulevard 49
1553 Copenhagen V / DK
Application number, filing date05803992.622.11.2005
[2007/34]
WO2005DK00741
Priority number, dateDK2004000184926.11.2004         Original published format: DK 200401849
US20040631286P26.11.2004         Original published format: US 631286 P
[2007/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006056198
Date:01.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1819500
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006
[2007/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1819500
Date:26.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:B29C53/08, H04R25/00, B29C53/84
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HALTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN EINES SCHALLFÜHRUNGSROHRS[2007/34]
English:HOLDER AND METHOD FOR SHAPING A SOUND TUBE[2007/34]
French:SUPPORT ET METHODE POUR LE FAÇONNAGE D'UN TUBE ACOUSTIQUE[2010/20]
Former [2007/34]PROCEDE D'APPORT D'UN TUBE SONORE A FORME PREFAÇONNEE
Entry into regional phase26.06.2007National basic fee paid 
26.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/34]
17.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
31.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2010Fee for grant paid
06.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10184130.2  / EP2276270
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.10.2011  04.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street
No. 08-08
18 Tai Seng
Singapore 539775 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
 [2018/09]
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2011  04.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent, No 06-08
Singapur 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2015/29]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2011  04.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2011/50]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2011  04.11.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
Niewalda, Gregor
SIEMENS AG CT IP Postfach 221634
80506 Munchen / DE
02.12.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition12.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1271/16
19.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1271/16
02.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2011
BE26.01.2011
CY26.01.2011
CZ26.01.2011
EE26.01.2011
FI26.01.2011
HU26.01.2011
IT26.01.2011
LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
NL26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
RO26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
SI26.01.2011
SK26.01.2011
TR26.01.2011
BG26.04.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
IE22.11.2011
LU22.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT26.01.2011
BE26.01.2011
CY26.01.2011
CZ26.01.2011
EE26.01.2011
FI26.01.2011
IT26.01.2011
LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
NL26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
RO26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
SI26.01.2011
SK26.01.2011
TR26.01.2011
BG26.04.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
IE22.11.2011
LU22.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2011/50]AT26.01.2011
BE26.01.2011
CY26.01.2011
CZ26.01.2011
EE26.01.2011
FI26.01.2011
LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
NL26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
RO26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
SI26.01.2011
SK26.01.2011
BG26.04.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
Former [2011/48]AT26.01.2011
BE26.01.2011
CY26.01.2011
EE26.01.2011
FI26.01.2011
LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
NL26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
SI26.01.2011
BG26.04.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
Former [2011/39]AT26.01.2011
BE26.01.2011
CY26.01.2011
FI26.01.2011
LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
NL26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
SI26.01.2011
BG26.04.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
Former [2011/37]BE26.01.2011
CY26.01.2011
FI26.01.2011
LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
SI26.01.2011
BG26.04.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT26.01.2011
LV26.01.2011
PL26.01.2011
SE26.01.2011
GR27.04.2011
ES07.05.2011
IS26.05.2011
PT26.05.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3939352  (BUNDY GMBH, 6900 HEIDELBERG, DE) [X] 1-4,6,5,7 * column 1, lines 3-9 * * column 3, lines 44-54,63-65 * * column 4, lines 8-13 * * figures 1-4 * * the whole document *;
 [X]JPS5914918  ;
 [DA]EP1448014  (GN RESOUND A/S) [DA] 7 * figure 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840511), vol. 008, no. 100, Database accession no. (M - 295), & JP59014918 A 19840125 (MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-4,6,5,7 * abstract * * the whole document *