Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1802370

EP1802370 - APPARATUS FOR RENAL NEUROMODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/27]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR RENAL NEUROMODULATION
[2010/25]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.12.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
06.12.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l.
102 rue des Maraîchers
2124 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]For all designated states
Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l.
102 rue des Maraîchers
2124 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2007/27]For all designated states
Ardian, Inc.
199 Jefferson Drive
Menlo Park CA 91025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEEM, Mark
685 Sierra Avenue
Mountain View, CA / US
02 / GIFFORD, Hanson, III
3108 Woodside Road
Woodside, CA / US
03 / DEMARAIS, Denise
1540 Shannon Drive
Los Gatos, CA / US
04 / SUTTON, Douglas
1595 Adobe Drive
Pacifica, CA / US
05 / THAI, Erik
2318 Brushgen Way
San Jose, CA / US
06 / GELFAND, Mark
304 Eighth Avenue, Apt. 3
New York, NY 10001 / US
07 / LEVIN, Howard, R.
640 Pompander Walk
Teaneck, NJ 07666 / US
 [2010/43]
Former [2007/27]01 / DEEM, Mark
685 Sierra Avenue
Mountain View, CA / US
02 / GIFFORD, Hanson, III
3108 Woodside Road
Woodside, CA / US
03 / DEMARAIS, Denise
1540 Shannon Drive
Los Gatos, CA / US
04 / SUTTON, Douglas
1595 Adobe Drive
Pacifica, CA / US
05 / THAI, Erik
2318 Brushgen Way
San Jose, CA / US
06 / GELFAND, Mark
196 Grand Stree
New York, NY 10013 / US
07 / LEVIN, Howard, R.
640 Pompander Walk
Teaneck, NJ 07666 / US
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2012/13]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2007/27]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date05806045.005.10.2005
[2007/27]
WO2005US35757
Priority number, dateUS20040616254P05.10.2004         Original published format: US 616254 P
US20040624793P02.11.2004         Original published format: US 624793 P
US2005012976513.05.2005         Original published format: US 129765
[2007/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006041881
Date:20.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1802370
Date:04.07.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006
[2007/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1802370
Date:05.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/08
[2007/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/27]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄT FÜR DIE RENALE NEUROMODULATION[2010/25]
English:APPARATUS FOR RENAL NEUROMODULATION[2010/25]
French:APPAREIL POUR UNE NEUROMODULATION RENALE[2010/25]
Former [2007/27]VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DIE RENALE NEUROMODULATION
Former [2007/27]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR RENAL NEUROMODULATION
Former [2007/27]METHODES ET APPAREIL POUR UNE NEUROMODULATION RENALE
Entry into regional phase13.04.2007National basic fee paid 
13.04.2007Search fee paid 
13.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/27]
19.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2010Fee for grant paid
12.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10190952.1  / EP2329859
EP11192511.1  / EP2457614
EP11192514.5  / EP2457615
EP12167931.0  / EP2495012
EP12180426.4  / EP2561902
EP12180427.2  / EP2570154
EP12180428.0  / EP2561903
EP12180430.6  / EP2561904
EP12180431.4  / EP2561905
EP12180432.2  / EP2572753
EP14190890.5  / EP2868344
EP16160715.5  / EP3056242
EP16183801.6  / EP3132825
EP16184488.1  / EP3108930
EP16200322.2  / EP3159037
EP18200365.7  / EP3446747
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.10.2011  13.10.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/46]
Opponent(s)01  05.10.2011  13.10.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
15.11.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.06.2013Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03)
20.06.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.09.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.03.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.04.2014
08.04.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.11.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/02]
Appeal following opposition30.04.2014Appeal received No.  T1066/14
14.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2011
CY05.01.2011
CZ05.01.2011
DK05.01.2011
EE05.01.2011
FI05.01.2011
HU05.01.2011
LT05.01.2011
LV05.01.2011
PL05.01.2011
RO05.01.2011
SE05.01.2011
SI05.01.2011
SK05.01.2011
TR05.01.2011
BG05.04.2011
GR06.04.2011
IS05.05.2011
PT05.05.2011
LU05.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT05.01.2011
CY05.01.2011
CZ05.01.2011
DK05.01.2011
EE05.01.2011
FI05.01.2011
LT05.01.2011
LV05.01.2011
PL05.01.2011
RO05.01.2011
SE05.01.2011
SI05.01.2011
SK05.01.2011
TR05.01.2011
BG05.04.2011
GR06.04.2011
IS05.05.2011
PT05.05.2011
LU05.10.2011
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2011/39]AT05.01.2011
CY05.01.2011
FI05.01.2011
LT05.01.2011
LV05.01.2011
PL05.01.2011
SE05.01.2011
SI05.01.2011
BG05.04.2011
GR06.04.2011
IS05.05.2011
PT05.05.2011
Former [2011/37]CY05.01.2011
FI05.01.2011
LT05.01.2011
LV05.01.2011
PL05.01.2011
SE05.01.2011
SI05.01.2011
BG05.04.2011
GR06.04.2011
IS05.05.2011
PT05.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT05.01.2011
LV05.01.2011
PL05.01.2011
SE05.01.2011
SI05.01.2011
GR06.04.2011
IS05.05.2011
PT05.05.2011
Former [2011/32]SI05.01.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2003216792  (LEVIN HOWARD R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,14-41 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0051] , [0062] , [0064] , [0065] , [0089] - [0092] - [0095] - [0097] - [0117] , [0119] * [Y] 4,5,7-13;
 [Y]US2002183682  (DARVISH NISSIM [IL], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0230] *;
 [Y]US6219577  (BROWN III CHARLES L [US], et al) [Y] 5,7-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6616624  (KIEVAL ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-41 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6219577  (BROWN III CHARLES L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5944710  (DEV SUKHENDU B [US], et al)