Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1817695

EP1817695 - READING ALERTS AND SKIM-READING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freedom Scientific Inc.
11800 31st Court North St. Petersburg
Florida 33716-1805 / US
[2007/33]
Inventor(s)01 / GORDON, Glen
11800 31st Court North
St. Petersburg, FL 33716-1805 / US
02 / STEPHEN, Joseph, K.
11800 31st Court North
St. Petersburg, FL 33716-1805 / US
03 / DAMERY, Eric
11800 31st Court North
St. Petersburg, FL 33716-1805 / US
04 / OCAMPO, Ralph, E.
11800 31st Court North
St. Petersburg, FL 33716-1805 / US
 [2007/33]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Former [2007/33]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date05807328.912.10.2005
[2007/33]
WO2005US36746
Priority number, dateUS20040522544P12.10.2004         Original published format: US 522544 P
[2007/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006042292
Date:20.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1817695
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006
[2007/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G09B21/00
[2008/37]
Former International [2007/33]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM LESEN VON WARNMELDUNGEN UND SKIM[2007/33]
English:READING ALERTS AND SKIM-READING SYSTEM[2007/33]
French:ALERTES DE LECTURE ET SYSTEME DE PARCOURS DE TEXTES[2007/33]
Entry into regional phase03.04.2007National basic fee paid 
03.04.2007Search fee paid 
03.04.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/33]
12.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
23.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0968/16
01.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US5404514  ;
 [Y]US6440068  ;
 [Y]US5721897  ;
 [Y]US5576955  ;
 [Y]US2002147724  ;
 [Y]US6697781