blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1812981

EP1812981 - A TYPE OF EXPLOSION PREVENTIVE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Byd Company Limited
Yan An Road, Kuichong Town, Longgang District Shenzhen City
Guangdong 518119 / CN
[2007/31]
Inventor(s)01 / MAO, Dehe, c/o BYD COMPANY LIMITED
Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518119 / CN
02 / XU, Jiaolian, c/o BYD COMPANY LIMITED
Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518119 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Zhongtao, c/o BYD COMPANY LIMITED
Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518119 / CN
 [2007/46]
Former [2007/31]01 / MAO, Dehe
Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518119 / CN
02 / XU, Jiaolian
Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518119 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Zhongtao
Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518119 / CN
Representative(s)Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/31]Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje
Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date05808330.416.11.2005
[2007/31]
WO2005CN01931
Priority number, dateCN2004295560U16.11.2004         Original published format: CN 200420095560 U
[2007/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2006053493
Date:26.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1812981
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1812981
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN26.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2007
ClassificationIPC:H01M2/12
[2007/31]
CPC:
H01M50/3425 (EP,KR,US); H01M50/20 (KR); H01M50/10 (KR);
H01M50/103 (EP,KR,US); H01M50/147 (KR); Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BATTERIE MIT EXPLOSIONSSCHUTZ[2007/31]
English:A TYPE OF EXPLOSION PREVENTIVE BATTERY[2007/31]
French:TYPE DE BATTERIE DE PREVENTION CONTRE LES EXPLOSIONS[2007/31]
Entry into regional phase08.11.2006National basic fee paid 
08.11.2006Search fee paid 
08.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/31]
18.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2009Fee for grant paid
11.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
TR02.09.2009
IE16.11.2009
LU16.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE16.11.2009
LU16.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
Former [2011/22]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE16.11.2009
LU16.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2011/16]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE16.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/46]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
IE16.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR03.12.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/40]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/30]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/28]BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/24]CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
RO02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
IS02.01.2010
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/20]CY02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
Former [2010/19]CY02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
ES13.12.2009
Former [2010/16]CY02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Former [2010/13]FI02.09.2009
LT02.09.2009
LV02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1258931  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9* figures 1,2A-2C,4A-4C,10 *
International search[A]CN2373901Y  (QIU SHANXIN [CN]);
 [X]JP2000223102  (NEC MOBILE ENERGY KK);
 [A]JP2001035467  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD);
 [A]JP2001143664  (GS MELCOTEC CO LTD);
 [X]JP2002237283  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD);
 [A]CN1386307  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.