EP1791997 - HIGH STRENGTH JOINING SYSTEM FOR FIBER REINFORCED COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBERMEYER, Henry K 303 West County Road 74 Wellington, CO 80549 / US | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBERT, Eric, N. 504 S. Grant Avenue Fort Collins, CO 80521 / US | 02 /
BAKER, Grant, Quinn 5225 White Willow Drive, C-120 Fort Collins, CO 80528 / US | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Doble, Richard George Vivian Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Doble, Richard George Vivian Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/23] | Doble, Richard George Vivian Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05813025.3 | 31.08.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005US31243 | Priority number, date | US20040606231P | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 606231 P | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006026734 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1791997 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791997 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D05B35/00, B29C70/54, B29C35/02, B29C65/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
B29C65/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/14 (KR,US);
B05D1/32 (US);
B29C65/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/1406 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/483 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/5028 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/721 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/7394 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/81455 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/546 (EP,KR,US);
C08L29/04 (KR,US);
B29C35/0266 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/72525 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/73755 (EP,KR,US);
B29C66/73793 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2061/04 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2063/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2083/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/23] | D05B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FASERVERSTÄRKTE VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE | [2007/23] | English: | HIGH STRENGTH JOINING SYSTEM FOR FIBER REINFORCED COMPOSITES | [2007/23] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASSEMBLAGE HAUTE TENUE POUR DES MATERIAUX COMPOSITES A FIBRES | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2005 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | IE | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | LU | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
LU | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0433836 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]FR2718074 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,15 * claims 1,5-10 *; | [A]WO03020495 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0017] , [0023] , [0024] , [0029] *; | [A]EP1428650 (HEXCEL COMPOSITES LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] *; | [A] - PFUND B, "RESIN INFUSION IN THE US MARINE INDUSTRY", REINFORCED PLASTICS, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19941201), vol. 38, no. 12, ISSN 0034-3617, pages 32 - 34, XP000478251 [A] 1,3,5-7,15 * page 33, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * | International search | [A]US4745008 (PLOTZKER IRENE G [US], et al); | [A]US5187018 (GLEMET MICHEL [FR]); | [A]US5350545 (STRECKERT HOLGER H [US], et al); | [A]US2003214064 (SHIN HYUN KYU [KR], et al); | [AP]US2005053787 (YAMASAKI MASAKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0433836B | FR2718074 | US5464059 | US5879492 | US6645610 | US6712099 | US6821368 | - J. M. KOYLER ET AL., INTL. SAMPE TECH. CONF. SERIES, (2000), vol. 45, page 365 | - D. M. GLEICH ET AL., INTL. SAMPE TECH. CONF. SERIES, (2000), vol. 45, page 818 | - R. H. BOSSI, R. L. NEREBERG, INTL. SAMPE TECH. CONF. SERIES, (2000), vol. 45, page 1787 |