Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1828513

EP1828513 - HINGE FOR DOORS, WINDOWS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Hahn GmbH & Co. KG
Trompeterallee 162-170
41189 Mönchengladbach-Wickrath / DE
[2007/36]
Inventor(s)01 / PALMOWSKY, Hans-Jürgen
Krickelberg 106
41836 Hückelhoven / DE
 [2007/46]
Former [2007/36]01 / PALMOWSKY, Hans-Jürgen
Sperberweg 36
41836 Hückelhoven / DE
Representative(s)Kluin, Jörg-Eden
Patentanwalt
Benrather Schlossallee 111
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/36]Kluin, Jörg-Eden
Patentanwalt Benrather Schlossallee 111
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date05813613.608.12.2005
[2007/36]
WO2005EP13134
Priority number, dateDE20042019974U24.12.2004         Original published format: DE 202004019974 U
[2007/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006072330
Date:13.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1828513
Date:05.09.2007
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1828513
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:E05D5/02
[2007/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BAND FÜR TÜREN, FENSTER UND DERGLEICHEN[2007/36]
English:HINGE FOR DOORS, WINDOWS OR THE LIKE[2007/36]
French:BANDE POUR PORTES, FENÊTRES ET ÉLÉMENTS SIMILAIRES[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2007National basic fee paid 
18.07.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
24.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2009Fee for grant paid
07.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/32]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/02]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/13]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/01]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[YA]AT384269B  (WALDNER FA FELIX [AT]) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 9; figure - * [A] 3-7;
 [Y]DE19700829  (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 23 - line 31 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 35; figure 3 *;
 [AD]EP1255010  (SAVIO SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *