Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1838603

EP1838603 - DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE REEL IN AN UNWINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/40]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CHANGING THE REEL IN AN UNWINDER
[2010/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Futura S.p.A.
Via per coselli, 9/9A
55060 Badia a Cantignano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
Futura S.p.A
Via per coselli, 9/9A
55060 Badia a Cantignano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / PETRI, Stefano
Via di Tiglio 340, Fraz. Massa Macinaia
I-55060 Capannori (Lucca) / IT
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Strasser, Wolfgang
Patentanwälte
Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz
Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 14
85521 Ottobrunn-Riemerling / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/46]Strasser, Wolfgang
Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rosenheimer Landstrasse 87
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Former [2007/40]Strasser, Wolfgang
Innere-Wiener Strasse 8
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date05813637.503.11.2005
[2007/40]
WO2005IT00630
Priority number, dateIT2005FI0001018.01.2005         Original published format: IT FI20050010
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006077609
Date:27.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1838603
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1838603
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/18, B65H16/06, B65H19/12
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM WECHSELN DER ROLLE IN EINER ABWICKELVORRICHTUNG[2010/42]
English:DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE REEL IN AN UNWINDER[2010/42]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR CHANGER LA BOBINE D'UNE DEROULEAUSE[2010/42]
Former [2007/40]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM WECHSELN DER ROLLEN IN EINER ABWICKELVORRICHTUNG
Former [2007/40]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CHANGING THE REEL IN AN UNWINDER
Former [2007/40]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CHANGER LA BOBINE D'UN DEVIDOIR
Entry into regional phase27.06.2007National basic fee paid 
27.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
13.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2011Fee for grant paid
28.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09007002.0  / EP2090533
Opposition(s)30.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
HU27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
BG27.07.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
IE03.11.2011
LU03.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/29]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
BG27.07.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
IE03.11.2011
LU03.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/25]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
IE03.11.2011
LU03.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/47]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
IE03.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/33]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/11]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
PL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2012/10]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
RO27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2012/09]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT27.04.2011
BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
NL27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY27.04.2011
LT27.04.2011
LV27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
IS27.08.2011
PT29.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/47]LT27.04.2011
PT29.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3575759  (PASQUINELLI BRUNO B) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 16 * * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 23; figures 1-3 * [Y] 7;
 [Y]US6051095  (BUTTERWORTH TAD T [US]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 30 * * column 6, line 53 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4869436  (MOBLEY GEORGE A [US]) [A] 10 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 40; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US3194508  (GUNTHER NETZE) [A] 10 * column 4, line 65 - column 6, line 60; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]JP2002087661
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, [A] 10 * abstract *